Mendell v. Doe, et al.
Plaintiff: Zachary T. Mendell
Defendant: John & Jane Doe 2-10 and I John Doe
Case Number: 1:2020cv00499
Filed: October 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Zachary T. Mendell. Motions terminated: #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Zachary T. Mendell (Notice sent to Finance). Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
November 18, 2020 Filing 4 Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Zachary T. Mendell. (jd)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (kt)
October 28, 2020 Filing 2 PRISONER COMPLAINT against Zachary T. Mendell, filed by Zachary T. Mendell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(kt)
October 28, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Zachary T. Mendell. Responses due by 11/19/2020 (kt) Modified on 10/29/2020 to correct date filed (kt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendell v. Doe, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary T. Mendell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John & Jane Doe 2-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?