Adler v. Sun Valley Company
Plaintiff: Sheila M. Adler
Defendant: Sun Valley Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00519
Filed: November 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Referring Judge: M Douglas Harpool
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sheila M. Adler. Sun Valley Company waiver sent on 11/23/2020, answer due 1/22/2021. (Williams, Daniel)
December 2, 2020 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. This case has been reassigned to Judge Harpool. Please use case number 1:20-cv-00519-MDH on all future pleadings. (st)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is reassigned to Judge M. Douglas Harpool from the Western District of Missouri. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
November 13, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Sun Valley Company. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jd)
November 13, 2020 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Judge B. Lynn Winmill for all further proceedings. Judge Ronald E. Bush no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 1:20-cv-00519-BLW. (jd)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER OF RECUSAL: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 455, the undersigned U.S. Magistrate Judge hereby issues this Order recusing himself from any further proceedings in this matter. The Clerk is requested to reassign this matter to another U.S. Magistrate Judge or U.S. District Judge. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (dg)
November 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Sun Valley Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-2127686.), filed by Sheila M. Adler. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet)(Williams, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adler v. Sun Valley Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Valley Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila M. Adler
Represented By: Daniel E Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?