Scalia v. Dennis Dillon Chrysler Jeep Dodge LLC
Plaintiff: Eugene Scalia
Defendant: DENNIS DILLON CHRYSLER JEEP DODGE LLC dba DENNIS DILLON CHRYSLER JEEP DODGE,an Idaho limited liability company and Dennis Dillon Chrysler Jeep Dodge LLC an Idaho limited liability company doing business as Dennis Dillon Chrysler Jeep Dodge
Case Number: 1:2020cv00601
Filed: December 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Referring Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:651
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2021 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #6 Notice of Availability was filed incorrectly in this case. Please disregard.(kt)
February 9, 2021 Filing 6 DISREGARD - NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Dennis Dillon Chrysler Jeep Dodge LLC, Eugene Scalia Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 4/12/2021. (kt) Modified on 2/10/2021, see corrective entry (kt).
January 7, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Dennis Dillon Chrysler Jeep Dodge LLC.(Collaer, Phillip)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CONSENT JUDGMENT. Defendant shall, no later than 30 days from the entry of this Order, pay RONALD LEE FREDERICK, JR. the sum of $45,000, which shall be inclusive of all special and general damages, by check at the address to be provided by the Plaintiff. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (kt)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER - The parties have notified the Court that they have reached a consent judgment in this matter. Because not all parties that have appeared have consented to the jurisdiction of a magistrate judge to enter final orders in this case, the Clerk is directed to reassign this matter to a district judge for further proceedings to effectuate the parties' settlement. See Williams v. King, 875 F.3d 500 (9th Cir. 2017). Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (klw)
January 4, 2021 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case randomly reassigned to Judge David C. Nye for all further proceedings. Judge Candy W. Dale no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 1:20-cv-601-DCN (jp)
December 31, 2020 Filing 2 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment David Edeli appearing for Plaintiff Eugene Scalia. Responses due by 1/21/2021 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Consent Judgment)(Edeli, David)
December 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DENNIS DILLON CHRYSLER JEEP DODGE LLC dba DENNIS DILLON CHRYSLER JEEP DODGE,an Idaho limited liability company, filed by Eugene Scalia. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Edeli, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scalia v. Dennis Dillon Chrysler Jeep Dodge LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Scalia
Represented By: David Edeli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DENNIS DILLON CHRYSLER JEEP DODGE LLC dba DENNIS DILLON CHRYSLER JEEP DODGE,an Idaho limited liability company
Represented By: Tracy Jack Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Dillon Chrysler Jeep Dodge LLC an Idaho limited liability company doing business as Dennis Dillon Chrysler Jeep Dodge
Represented By: Tracy Jack Crane
Represented By: Phillip J Collaer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?