Byrd v. Little et al
Plaintiff: Richard F Byrd
Defendant: Bradley J Little and Dave Jeppensen
Case Number: 1:2021cv00001
Filed: January 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Referring Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2021 Filing 28 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Dayton Patrick Reed appearing for Defendants Dave Jeppensen, Bradley J Little. Responses due by 3/22/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A)(Reed, Dayton)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Byrd's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. #2 ) is DENIED. Byrd's Motion to Amend/Supplement (Dkts. 7,8, 11) are GRANTED. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (kt)
February 25, 2021 Filing 26 Letter from Richard Byrd re #25 . (Sent Mr. Byrd an updated docket sheet indicating docket numbers are out of order due to clerical error)(kt)
February 14, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Richard F Byrd re #23 Response to Motion (kt)
February 13, 2021 Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion re #20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by Richard F Byrd. Replies due by 3/1/2021.(kt)
February 9, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Filing of Petition for a Writ of Mandamus at the 9th Circuit by Richard F Byrd re #21 . (Attachments: #1 dkt 19, #2 dkt 19-4)(jp)
February 5, 2021 Filing 21 USCA Case Number 21-70250 re Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed by Richard F Byrd (Attachments: #1 Notice to All Parties and Counsel, #2 USCA Exhibits)(kt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/9/2021: #3 USCA Docket Sheet) (kt).
February 4, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Dayton Patrick Reed appearing for Defendants Dave Jeppensen, Bradley J Little. Responses due by 2/25/2021 (Reed, Dayton)
February 2, 2021 Filing 19 RESPONSE re #18 Disclosure of Additional Information re Mtn for TRO filed by Richard F Byrd. (Attachments: #1 1, #2 2, #3 3, #4 Letter to IDHW, #5 Certificate of Service)(kt) Corrected filed date on 2/3/2021 (kt).
February 2, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE by Dave Jeppensen, Bradley J Little Disclosure of Additional Information re Mtn for TRO (Reed, Dayton)
January 29, 2021 Filing 17 Letter from Richard Byrd, inquiry on filing fees. (kt)
January 27, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard F Byrd re #15 Reply to Response to Motion (kt)
January 26, 2021 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION to Expedite, #7 MOTION to Amend/Correct, filed by Richard F Byrd.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/27/2021.(kt)
January 24, 2021 Filing 25 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Richard F Byrd. (Attachments: #1 Letter to the Clerk of the Court, #2 Certificate of Service)(kt) Modified on 2/18/2021 to correct date filed (kt).
January 22, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION to Expedite, #7 MOTION to Amend/Correct #2 MOTION to Expedite Opposition to Mandatory TRO filed by Dave Jeppensen, Bradley J Little. Replies due by 2/5/2021.(Reed, Dayton)
January 20, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard F Byrd. Dave Jeppensen served on 1/15/2021, answer due 2/5/2021; Bradley J Little served on 1/15/2021, answer due 2/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Email re Acceptance of Serivice)(kt)
January 20, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE by Dave Jeppensen, Bradley J Little re #1 Complaint Acceptance of Service (Reed, Dayton)
January 20, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Submit Additional Documents to Support #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Richard F Byrd. Responses due by 2/10/2021 (Attachments: #1 Worldometer Report, #2 ACIP Report, #3 CDC Report)(kt)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER granting #9 Motion to Withdraw consent. The Clerk is directed to reassign this matter to a district judge. The Clerk is further directed to serve a copy of this Order on Plaintiff at his mailing address and email address of record. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (klw)
January 19, 2021 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Judge David C. Nye for all further proceedings. Judge Candy W. Dale no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 1:21-cv-00001-DCN (kt)
January 17, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Withdraw Consent to Assignment of Complaint to the Magistrate Division by Plaintiff Richard F Byrd. Responses due by 2/8/2021 (kt)
January 16, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Admit Document Inadvertently Omited from #7 MOTION to Amendby Plaintiff Richard F Byrd. Responses due by 2/8/2021 (Attachments: #1 Morbidity and Mortality Weekly Report (April 17, 2020))(kt)
January 15, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend #2 MOTION to Expedite by Plaintiff Richard F Byrd. Responses due by 2/5/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Death Counts Female, #6 Death Counts Male, #7 Morbidity and Mortality Weekly Report (Dec. 2020), #8 Morbidity and Mortality Weekly Report (Dec. 2020))(kt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/19/2021: #9 Immunization Practices) (kt).
January 14, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Dave Jeppensen and Bradley J Little. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons Dave Jeppensen)(kt)
January 13, 2021 Filing 5 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (kt)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. Until the Complaint and Motion to Expedite are properly served on Defendants, and all parties have consented to the jurisdiction of a magistrate judge to hear all aspects of this case, the Court is unable to consider the claims raised therein. The Clerk is directed to serve a copy of this Order on Plaintiff at his mailing address and email address of record. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (kt)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 3/15/2021 11:00 AM mountain time in Other before Judge Candy W. Dale. All parties shall use the Courts AT&T teleconferencing line to connect to this hearing, by dialing: 1-888-273-3658, Access Code: 5475731, Security Code: 5637. On or before March 8, 2021, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw) Additional information included to docket text on 1/12/2021 (kt).
January 8, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Expedite Life and Death Matter by Plaintiff Richard F Byrd. Responses due by 1/29/2021 (kt)
January 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for a Civil Case against Dave Jeppensen, Bradley J Little, filed by Richard F Byrd. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(kt)
January 4, 2021 RECEIPT: Check Fee Received $ 402, receipt # 27400 (kt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Byrd v. Little et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard F Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley J Little
Represented By: Dayton Patrick Reed
Represented By: Steven Lamar Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Jeppensen
Represented By: Dayton Patrick Reed
Represented By: Steven Lamar Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?