Jackson v. City of Twin Falls County et al
Petitioner: Michael E. Jackson
Respondent: City of Twin Falls County and Idaho Department of Corrections
Case Number: 1:2021cv00013
Filed: January 6, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2021 Filing 6 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Michael E. Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Cover Letter)(jd)
January 7, 2021 Filing 3 DISREGARD NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Michael E. Jackson. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 3/8/2021. (kt) Modified on 1/7/2021 (kt). Modified on 1/7/2021, see corrective entry (jd).
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (kt)
January 7, 2021 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. Per IRO in case 1:20-cv-485, Case reassigned to Judge B. Lynn Winmill for all further proceedings. Judge Candy W. Dale no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 1:21-cv-00013-BLW. (kt)
January 7, 2021 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #3 Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline filed by Michael E. Jackson was entered in error in this case. Please disregard. (kt) Modified on 1/7/2021, Mr. Anderson has indicated that he can't sign the consent because Mr. Jackson is in pretrial custody in the Twin Falls County Jail. The Idaho Attorney General's office does not represent Twin Falls County or it's jail. (jd).
January 6, 2021 Filing 1 EMERGENCY Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Michael E. Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Initial Review Order)(kt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. City of Twin Falls County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: City of Twin Falls County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Idaho Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael E. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?