Chew, et al. v. Bedke
Plaintiff: Susan B Chew, Marianne Muffy Davis, Marianne Davis, Susan Chew and Muffy
Defendant: Scott Bedke and The Legislature of the State of Idaho; Scott Bedke
Case Number: 1:2021cv00014
Filed: January 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 794
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Susan Chew, Marianne Davis (Gannon, John)
February 22, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE by The Legislature of the State of Idaho; Scott Bedke re #14 Response to Motion, Notice of Supplemental Authority (Bennett, A.)
February 7, 2021 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Correction to Memorandum in Response filed by Marianne Davis.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/8/2021.(Gannon, John)
February 4, 2021 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Second Declaration of David Pate filed by Marianne Davis.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Second Declaration of Ilana Rubel, #2 Second Declaration of Marianne Muffy Davis)(Gannon, John)
February 4, 2021 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Susan Chew, Marianne "Muffy" Davis filed by Marianne Davis.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Gannon)(Gannon, John)
February 2, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by The Legislature of the State of Idaho; Scott Bedke. Replies due by 2/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Second Declaration of Scott Bedke, #2 Second Declaration of Megan Blanksma, #3 Declaration of Carrie Maulin, #4 Declaration of Jennifer Novak, #5 Declaration of MaryLou Molitor, #6 Declaration of A. Dean Bennett)(Bennett, A.)
January 29, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Responses due by 2/2/2021. Replies due by 2/4/2021. (jd)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion to Shorten Time with respect to their Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Dkt. 12) is GRANTED. Defendants shall file their Response before 5:00 p.m. on February 2, 2021. Plaintiffs shall file their Reply, if any, before 5:00 p.m. on February 4, 2021. Signed by Judge David C. Nye (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (bm)
January 27, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction John L Gannon appearing for Plaintiffs Susan Chew, Marianne Davis. Responses due by 2/17/2021 (Attachments: #1 Motion to Shorten Time, #2 Memorandum In Support, #3 Memorandum Exhibits 1-7, #4 Pate Declaration, #5 Pate Declaration Exhibit 1, #6 Pate Declaration Exhibit 2-8, #7 Chew Declaration, #8 Nelson Declaration, #9 Davis Declaration)(Gannon, John)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - Plaintiffs Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. #2 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
January 11, 2021 Filing 10 TRIAL BRIEF Memorandum in Reply to Defendants Memorandum by Marianne Davis. (Gannon, John)
January 8, 2021 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Megan Blanksma re #8 Response to Motion, #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Susan Chew, Marianne "Muffy" Davis filed by The Legislature of the State of Idaho; Scott Bedke . (Bennett, A.)
January 8, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Susan Chew, Marianne "Muffy" Davis filed by The Legislature of the State of Idaho; Scott Bedke. Replies due by 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott Bedke)(Bennett, A.)
January 8, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to The Legislature of the State of Idaho; Scott Bedke. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jd)
January 8, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Susan Chew, Marianne Davis and counsel for The Legislature of the State of Idaho; Scott Bedke re #1 Complaint and #4 Notice of Appearance. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 3/9/2021. (jd)
January 7, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE by Scott Bedke of Intent to Respond and Oppose Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Bennett, A.)
January 7, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by A. Dean Bennett on behalf of Scott Bedke (Bennett, A.)
January 7, 2021 Filing 3 TRIAL BRIEF Susan Chew, Marianne "Muffy" Davis by Marianne Muffy Davis. (Gannon, John)
January 7, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Susan Chew, Marianne "Muffy" Davis John L Gannon appearing for Plaintiffs Susan B Chew, Marianne Muffy Davis. Responses due by 1/28/2021 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Melissa Wintrow, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Muffy Davis, #3 Affidavit Affidavit of John McCrostie, #4 Affidavit Affidavit of Ilana Rubel, #5 Affidavit Affidavit of Sue Chew)(Gannon, John)
January 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Susan Chew, Marianne "Muffy" Davis against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0976-2150150.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Complaint Chew and Davis)(Gannon, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chew, et al. v. Bedke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan B Chew
Represented By: John L Gannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marianne Muffy Davis
Represented By: John L Gannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marianne Davis
Represented By: John L Gannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Chew
Represented By: John L Gannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muffy
Represented By: John L Gannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Bedke
Represented By: A. Dean Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Legislature of the State of Idaho; Scott Bedke
Represented By: A. Dean Bennett
Represented By: William Gerry Myers, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?