Joslin v. Tewalt
Petitioner: Billy Lee Joslin, Jr
Respondent: Director IDOC Josh Tewalt
Case Number: 1:2021cv00020
Filed: January 11, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2021 Filing 6 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE(jp)
January 20, 2021 Filing 5 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (kt)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (alw)
January 11, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Stay re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Billy Lee Joslin, Jr. Responses due by 2/1/2021 (alw)
January 11, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Billy Lee Joslin, Jr re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 3/12/2021. (alw)
January 11, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Billy Lee Joslin, Jr.(alw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/12/2021: #1 cover letter) (alw).
January 11, 2021 RECEIPT: Fee Received $ 5, receipt # 1503 (alw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joslin v. Tewalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Billy Lee Joslin, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director IDOC Josh Tewalt
Represented By: L LaMont Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?