Rand et al v. Cook Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Ronald F. Rand and Susan L. Rand
Defendant: Cook Medical, LLC, William Cook Europe APS and Cook Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2021cv00078
Filed: February 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2021 Case has been opened in Southern District of Indiana as case 1:21-cv-06378. (jp)
March 24, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Clerk of electronic case transfer to Southern District of Indiana. re #7 Order Transferring Case to MDL Panel, (jp)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO MDL PANEL for Southern District of Indiana for MDL 2570 (CTO-132) (Attachments: #1 Email reflecting MDL entry -stay is lifted, #2 email of Text Only Entry transferring case)(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER- CTO 132 for MDL 2570 (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
February 25, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronald F. Rand, Susan L. Rand. William Cook Europe APS served on 2/22/2021, answer due 3/15/2021. (Larsen, Wes)
February 25, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronald F. Rand, Susan L. Rand. Cook Medical, LLC served on 2/22/2021, answer due 3/15/2021. (Larsen, Wes)
February 25, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronald F. Rand, Susan L. Rand. Cook Incorporated served on 2/22/2021, answer due 3/15/2021. (Larsen, Wes)
February 19, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical, LLC, William Cook Europe APS. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(jp)
February 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical, LLC, William Cook Europe APS ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0976-2170321.), filed by Ronald F. Rand, Susan L. Rand. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Larsen, Wes)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rand et al v. Cook Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Cook Europe APS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald F. Rand
Represented By: Wes S Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan L. Rand
Represented By: Wes S Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?