Ward, et al. v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Lynn Ward and Deborah Ward
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00099
Filed: March 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Clerk of Court of electronic case transfer to Northern District of California re 6 Order Transferring Case to MDL Panel. (jd)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO MDL PANEL for Northern District of California, MDL No. 2741, CTO-261. (Received from MDL No. 2741 - The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the N.D. California for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 3/22/2021. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2741, ARE/4:21-cv-00193, FLM/2:21-cv-00195, ID/1:21-cv-00099, ILC/4:21-cv-04015, MA/1:21-cv-10293, MSS/2:21-cv-00030 (CMD)) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd) (Main Document 6 replaced on 3/23/2021, attached certified copy of CTO) (jd).
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER- CTO (261) MDL NO. 2741. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
March 10, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey Lynn Ward, Deborah Ward. Monsanto Company served on 3/8/2021, answer due 3/29/2021. (Larsen, Wes)
March 5, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jd)
March 4, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by Deborah Ward, Jeffrey Lynn Ward REGARDING POTENTIAL MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION CASE (Larsen, Wes)
March 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against Monsanto Company ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0976-2178023.), filed by Jeffrey Lynn Ward, Deborah Ward. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Larsen, Wes)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ward, et al. v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Lynn Ward
Represented By: Wes S Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Ward
Represented By: Wes S Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?