Schroder v. Johnson, et al.
Plaintiff: Noah Schroder
Defendant: Chris Johnson, Rona Siegert and Physician's Assistant Reese
Case Number: 1:2021cv00106
Filed: March 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Noah Schroder.(jd)
April 26, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Review Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Noah Schroder. Responses due by 5/17/2021. (jd)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL REVIEW ORDER BY SCREENING JUDGE - The Complaint fails to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Plaintiff has 60 days within which to file an amended complaint as described above. If Plaintiff files an amended complaint, Plaintiff must also file a Motion to Review the Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (jd)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER NO FEE REQUIRED SEE ORDER DKT. 8 FILED IN CASE 1:20-cv-583-DCN - ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Noah Schroder. Motions terminated: 5 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Noah Schroder (Notice sent to Finance). Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd). Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INITIAL REVIEW ORDER BY SCREENING JUDGE FILED IN CASE 1:20-CV-583-DCN - The following claims are severed from this action: medical claims againstDefendants Chris Johnson, Rona Siegert, and Physicians Assistant Reese. TheClerk of Court shall open a new case and file a copy of Plaintiffs Complaint inthat action. The Court will issue a separate screening order in that case. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
March 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Noah Schroder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(jd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schroder v. Johnson, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rona Siegert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physician's Assistant Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noah Schroder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?