Johnson v. State of Idaho, et al.
Plaintiff: Eric Swain Johnson
Defendant: Does 1-10, Darryl Blanchard, Warden Valley Custody, State of Idaho, Idaho Department of Corrections and Keith Yordy
Case Number: 1:2021cv00262
Filed: June 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Referring Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2021 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Eric Swain Johnson.(kt)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL REVIEW ORDER BY SCREENING JUDGE - The Complaint fails to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Plaintiff has 60 days within which to file an amended complaint as described above. If Plaintiff does so, Plaintiff must file (along with the amended complaint) a Motion to Review the Amended Complaint. If Plaintiff does not amend within 60 days, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Alternatively, Plaintiff may file a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal if Plaintiff no longer intends to pursue this case. Plaintiffs request for appointment of counsel (contained in the Complaint) is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff may renew the request for counselin an amended complaint. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER FOR IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS AND WITHDRAWAL OF INMATE FILING FEE FROM PRISON TRUST ACCOUNT. IT IS ORDERED Plaintiff's Applications to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Dkts. #1 & #6 ) are GRANTED. The Director of the Idaho Department of Correction or a designee will collect from Plaintiff's prison trust account the $350.00 balance of the filing fee and will forward payments to the Clerk of Court in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). The payments must be clearly identified by the name and number assigned to this action. If multiple payments are forwarded to the Clerk of Court to satisfy filing fees in more than one case, each payment must be clearly identified by the name and number assigned to each action. The Clerk of Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on the Director of the Idaho Department of Correction, as follows: Josh Tewalt, Director, Idaho Department of Correction, Attn: Inmate Accounts, 1299 N Orchard, Suite 110, Boise ID 83706. Plaintiffs Motion for Mediation or Settlement (Dkt. #10 ) is DENIED as premature. The Complaint remains subject to screening under 28 U.S.C. 1915 and 1915A. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (Notice sent to Finance)(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (kt)
July 22, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Mediation or Settlement by Plaintiff Eric Swain Johnson. Responses due by 8/12/2021 (kt)
July 22, 2021 Filing 9 SECOND NOTICE of Change of Address by Eric Swain Johnson. (Address previously updated per docket 7) (kt)
July 22, 2021 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiff Eric Swain Johnson. (kt)
July 20, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by Eric Swain Johnson (address updated) (kt)
July 8, 2021 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Eric Swain Johnson. Responses due by 7/29/2021 (jp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/9/2021: #1 copy of envelope) (jp).
June 25, 2021 Filing 5 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (lm)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (lm)
June 25, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lm)
June 25, 2021 Filing 2 Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eric Swain Johnson. (lm)
June 25, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Eric Swain Johnson. Responses due by 7/16/2021 (lm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. State of Idaho, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darryl Blanchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Valley Custody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Idaho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Idaho Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Yordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Swain Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?