Calvillo v. Attorney General of Idaho
Petitioner: Valentin Calvillo
Respondent: Attorney General of Idaho
Case Number: 1:2021cv00293
Filed: July 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2021 Filing 8 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE(kt)
July 13, 2021 Filing 7 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jd)
July 13, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Valentin Calvillo Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 9/13/2021. (lm)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (lm)
July 12, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay and Abeyance by Petitioner Valentin Calvillo. Responses due by 8/2/2021. (jd)
July 12, 2021 Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus,filed by Valentin Calvillo. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Stay and Abeyance, #2 Envelope)(lm)
July 12, 2021 Filing 2 Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #1 Prisoner Application for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis Filed by Valentin Calvillo. (lm)
July 12, 2021 Filing 1 Prisoner Application for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Petitioner Valentin Calvillo. Responses due by 8/3/2021 (lm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calvillo v. Attorney General of Idaho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Valentin Calvillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of Idaho
Represented By: L LaMont Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?