Worley v. Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Victoria Worley
Defendant: Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. and Jeanette Montgomery
Case Number: 1:2021cv00327
Filed: August 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Office: Boise - Southern Office
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2021 Filing 29 Docket Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Candy W. Dale: Appearance by James Mason for the Plaintiff; Mark Orler for the Defendant. Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 9/8/2021. Court noted Stipulated Litigation and Discovery Plans were filed in this matter. Parties have consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. ADR to be completed on or before 8/17/2022, method to be later determined. Clawback order requested. Telephonic Status Conference to be later set in May/June 2022, with specific date/time to be included in forthcoming Scheduling Order. Time in Court 10:34-10:45 AM. (Hearing not recorded.) (at)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 1/31/2022. Discovery due by 8/17/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 8/31/2022. ADR shall take place by 8/17/2022. The Court will conduct a telephonic status conference with the parties on May 5, 2022, at 1:30 p.m. Mountain Time for the purpose of inquiring about the status of discovery and the parties preference for ADR. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (alw)
September 2, 2021 Filing 27 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE(alw)
September 2, 2021 Filing 26 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (alw)
September 1, 2021 Filing 25 DISCOVERY PLAN by Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. . (Orler, Mark)
September 1, 2021 Filing 24 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.. (Orler, Mark)
August 26, 2021 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint by Jeanette Montgomery, Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc..(Orler, Mark)
August 24, 2021 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.. (Orler, Mark)
August 23, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Jeanette Montgomery, Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. and Victoria Worley re #1 Notice of Removal. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 10/22/2021. (jd)
August 23, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Substitution - Attorney Donald J Farley,Mark J. Orler for Jeanette Montgomery,Donald J Farley,Mark J. Orler for Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. added. Attorney Bruce Alverson and Karie N. Wilson terminated. Request to Turn Electronic Noticing OFF (no longer receive NEFs in this case only) by Attorney (Orler, Mark)
August 23, 2021 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jd)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 9/8/2021 10:30 AM in Boise - Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. On or before September 1, 2021, the parties must file with the Court the jointLitigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (alw)
August 16, 2021 Filing 18 Case transferred in from District of Nevada; Case Number 2:21-cv-01024. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting #5 Motion to Change Venue and Denying as Moot #8 Motion to Remand to State Court. This matter shall be transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Idaho. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/05/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
August 16, 2021 All out of state counsel continuing representation need to obtain local counsel and file an Application for Pro Hac Vice. Please see Local Rule, Civil Rule 83.4 Bar Admission e) Pro Hac Vice/Local Counsel and ECF Procedures 3. Registration, Logins and Passwords. B. Limited Registered Participants. (kt)
July 23, 2021 Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 7/23/2021 #9 Motion.Presently before the court is a stipulated motion (ECF No. #9 ) to extend the time for plaintiff Victoria Worley to respond to defendant Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.'s motion to change venue. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED nunc pro tunc. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
July 12, 2021 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to #8 Motion to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Victoria Worley. (Hinckley, Eric)
July 8, 2021 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to #5 Motion to Change Venue by Defendant Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.. (Wilson, Karie)
July 6, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #8 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendant Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.. Replies due by 7/13/2021. (Wilson, Karie)
July 1, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE to #5 Motion to Change Venue by Plaintiff Victoria Worley. Replies due by 7/8/2021. (Hinckley, Eric)
June 25, 2021 Filing 11 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Victoria Worley. (Hinckley, Eric)
June 24, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Docket Correction to #9 filed by attorney Eric Hinckley. The Court has corrected and changed the event from Motion to Stipulation. No further action is required. Do not refile document. (no image attached) (SLD)
June 24, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to Respond re #5 Motion to Change Venue, by Plaintiff Victoria Worley. (Hinckley, Eric) Modified event on 6/24/2021 (SLD).
June 23, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Victoria Worley. Responses due by 7/7/2021. (Hinckley, Eric)
June 23, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Eric Hinckley on behalf of Plaintiff Victoria Worley. (Hinckley, Eric)
June 14, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #4 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendant Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.. (Wilson, Karie)
June 10, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Change Venue, filed by Defendant Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. Responses due by 6/24/2021. (Wilson, Karie)
May 28, 2021 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 5/28/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 6/12/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 6/27/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
May 28, 2021 Filing 3 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.. (Wilson, Karie)
May 28, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Wilson, Karie)
May 28, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court, Clark County, Case Number A-21-834719-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6504526) by Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.. Proof of service due by 8/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wilson, Karie) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
May 28, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (DRS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Worley v. Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Worley
Represented By: Eric Hinckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce Alverson
Represented By: Karie N. Wilson
Represented By: Donald J Farley
Represented By: Mark J. Orler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanette Montgomery
Represented By: Bruce Alverson
Represented By: Karie N. Wilson
Represented By: Donald J Farley
Represented By: Mark J. Orler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?