Vera Castrejon v. Twin Falls County, et al.
Plaintiff: Oscar Vera Castrejon
Defendant: Twin Falls County, Tom Carter and Does 1 through 110
Case Number: 1:2021cv00354
Filed: September 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2021 RECEIPT: Check Fee Received $ 402.00, receipt # 28671 Final Payment. (jd)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Vera Castrejons Application for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Dkt. #2 ) is DENIED. Vera Castrejon must pay the full filing fee within 30 days of this order. If the fee is not paid by that time, this case shall be subject to dismissal without further notice. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
September 7, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Renee Derden on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Derden, Nicole)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (lm)
September 3, 2021 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Jennifer Schrack Dempsey, Nicole Renee Derden appearing for Plaintiff Oscar Vera Castrejon. Responses due by 9/24/2021 (lm)
September 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tom Carter, Twin Falls County, filed by Oscar Vera Castrejon. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 In Forma Pauperis)(Dempsey, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vera Castrejon v. Twin Falls County, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Vera Castrejon
Represented By: Jennifer Schrack Dempsey
Represented By: Alyson Anne Foster
Represented By: Nicole Renee Derden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin Falls County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 110
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?