Pizzuto v. Tewalt, et al.
Plaintiff: Gerald Ross Pizzuto, Jr
Defendant: Josh Tewalt and Tyrell Davis
Case Number: 1:2021cv00359
Filed: September 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Referring Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2021 Filing 11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Kristina M Schindele appearing for Defendants Tyrell Davis, Josh Tewalt. Responses due by 11/19/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Schindele, Kristina)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER. Good cause appearing and lack of opposition, Defendant's Motion to Extend Time to File Answer or Motion Under Rule 12 Dkt. #9 is hereby GRANTED. Defendants must file their answer or Rule 12 motion on or before October 29, 2021. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (an)
October 1, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Kristina M Schindele appearing for Defendants Tyrell Davis, Josh Tewalt. Responses due by 10/22/2021 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Schindele, Kristina)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT. Case reassigned to Judge David C. Nye for all further proceedings. Judge B Lynn Winmill no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge B Lynn Winmill. (alw)
September 14, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gerald Ross Pizzuto, Jr. Josh Tewalt served on 9/10/2021, answer due 10/1/2021. (Horwitz, Jonah)
September 14, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gerald Ross Pizzuto, Jr. Tyrell Davis served on 9/10/2021, answer due 10/1/2021. (Horwitz, Jonah)
September 10, 2021 Filing 5 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #2 #3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Stanley J Panikowski, Amanda Camelotto for Gerald Ross Pizzuto, Jr Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
September 10, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Tyrell Davis, Josh Tewalt. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 summons)(alw)
September 9, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Amanda Camelotto. Jonah Horwitz appearing for Plaintiff Gerald Ross Pizzuto, Jr. Responses due by 9/30/2021 (Horwitz, Jonah)
September 9, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Stanley J. Panikowski. Jonah Horwitz appearing for Plaintiff Gerald Ross Pizzuto, Jr. Responses due by 9/30/2021 (Horwitz, Jonah)
September 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Equitable, Declaratory, and Injunctive Relief against Tyrell Davis, Josh Tewalt, filed by Gerald Ross Pizzuto, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Josh Tewalt, #3 Summons to Tyrell Davis)(Horwitz, Jonah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pizzuto v. Tewalt, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Ross Pizzuto, Jr
Represented By: Jonah J Horwitz
Represented By: Christopher M. Sanchez
Represented By: Miles Pope
Represented By: Amanda Laufer Camelotto
Represented By: Stanley J Panikowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Tewalt
Represented By: Kristina M Schindele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyrell Davis
Represented By: Kristina M Schindele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?