Hayes v. Corizon et al
Plaintiff: Michael T Hayes
Defendant: The Entity IDOC, The Entity Corizon, Corizon, IDOC, Rona Siegert, Sgt Barrows, C/O Anderson, RN Veronica Evancho, Timmermans and 6 Jane Does
Case Number: 1:2021cv00362
Filed: September 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2021 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Michael T Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(kt)
November 5, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Review Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Michael T Hayes. Responses due by 11/26/2021 (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(kt)
November 5, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF RECALL OF #8 Amended Complaint and #12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Michael T Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(kt)
October 20, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Michael T Hayes. Responses due by 11/10/2021 (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix, #3 Affidavit, #4 Cover Sheet To Affidavit)(kt)
October 18, 2021 Filing 11 Letter from Michael Hayes(kt)
October 14, 2021 Filing 10 SECOND Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. by Michael T Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(kt)
October 12, 2021 RECEIPT: Fee Received $ 402, receipt # 28714 (kt)
October 7, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Review Amend/Correct #8 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Michael T Hayes. Responses due by 10/28/2021 (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(kt)
September 27, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Michael T Hayes.(kt)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION denying #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If Plaintiff does not pay the $402.002 filing fee within 14 days, this case may be dismissed without prejudice without further notice. Alternatively, Plaintiff may file a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal if Plaintiff no longer intends to pursue this action, in which case no filing fee will be due. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (kt)
September 16, 2021 Filing 6 SECOND MOTION to Take Judicial Notice by Plaintiff Michael T Hayes. Responses due by 10/7/2021 (kt)
September 15, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Take Judicial Notice by Plaintiff Michael T Hayes. Responses due by 10/6/2021 (kt)
September 14, 2021 Filing 4 Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #3 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael T Hayes. (kt)
September 14, 2021 Filing 3 PRISONER APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Michael T Hayes. Responses due by 10/5/2021 (kt)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (kmp)
September 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Entity Corizon, The Entity IDOC, filed by Michael T Hayes.(kmp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hayes v. Corizon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael T Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Entity IDOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Entity Corizon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IDOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rona Siegert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt Barrows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RN Veronica Evancho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timmermans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 6 Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?