Citizens Allied for Integrity and Accountability, Inc. et al v. Miller et al
Plaintiff: Citizens Allied for Integrity and Accountability, Inc., Melvin Person, Terri Person, James Mitchell, Jan Mitchell, Sue Bixby, Martina Jaramiollo, Ryan Keck, Kristie Rae Cooper, Harvey Easton, Bernice Easton, Randy Payne and Teresa Payne
Defendant: Dustin Miller, Betty Coopersmith, Marc Shigeta, James Classen and Ray Hinchcliff
Case Number: 1:2021cv00367
Filed: September 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Raymond Edward Patricco
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 1/7/2022 01:00 PM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 7 before US Magistrate Judge Raymond Edward Patricco Jr. On or before December 31, 2021, the parties must file with the Court the JOINT Litigation Plan and Discovery Plans. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr. (alw)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Sue Bixby, Citizens Allied for Integrity and Accountability, Inc., James Classen, Kristie Rae Cooper, Betty Coopersmith, Bernice Easton, Harvey Easton, Ray Hinchcliff, Martina Jaramiollo, Ryan Keck, Dustin Miller, James Mitchell, Jan Mitchell, Randy Payne, Teresa Payne, Melvin Person, Terri Person, Marc Shigeta re #1 Complaint, #3 Notice of Appearance Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 12/27/2021. (alw)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristina Fugate on behalf of All Defendants (Fugate, Kristina)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(alw)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Violation of Property Rights against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIDDC-2271645.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Piotrowski, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Citizens Allied for Integrity and Accountability, Inc. et al v. Miller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Citizens Allied for Integrity and Accountability, Inc.
Represented By: James Marshall Piotrowski
Represented By: Marty Durand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Person
Represented By: James Marshall Piotrowski
Represented By: Marty Durand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri Person
Represented By: James Marshall Piotrowski
Represented By: Marty Durand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Mitchell
Represented By: Marty Durand
Represented By: James Marshall Piotrowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jan Mitchell
Represented By: James Marshall Piotrowski
Represented By: Marty Durand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sue Bixby
Represented By: James Marshall Piotrowski
Represented By: Marty Durand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martina Jaramiollo
Represented By: James Marshall Piotrowski
Represented By: Marty Durand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Keck
Represented By: James Marshall Piotrowski
Represented By: Marty Durand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristie Rae Cooper
Represented By: James Marshall Piotrowski
Represented By: Marty Durand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harvey Easton
Represented By: James Marshall Piotrowski
Represented By: Marty Durand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernice Easton
Represented By: James Marshall Piotrowski
Represented By: Marty Durand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Payne
Represented By: James Marshall Piotrowski
Represented By: Marty Durand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Payne
Represented By: James Marshall Piotrowski
Represented By: Marty Durand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Miller
Represented By: Joy M Vega
Represented By: Kristina Fugate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty Coopersmith
Represented By: Joy M Vega
Represented By: Kristina Fugate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Shigeta
Represented By: Joy M Vega
Represented By: Kristina Fugate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Classen
Represented By: Joy M Vega
Represented By: Kristina Fugate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hinchcliff
Represented By: Joy M Vega
Represented By: Kristina Fugate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?