Joslin v. Arce-Chinchilla et al
Plaintiff: Chase Joslin
Defendant: Dianna Stephanie Arce-Chinchilla and Ada County Misdemeanor Probation Department
Case Number: 1:2021cv00382
Filed: September 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #14 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment and Objection filed by Ada County Misdemeanor Probation Department, Dianna Stephanie Arce-Chinchilla. Replies due by 11/26/2021.(Jenkins, Andrew)
November 5, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Stay Discovery Andrew Jenkins appearing for Defendants Ada County Misdemeanor Probation Department, Dianna Stephanie Arce-Chinchilla. Responses due by 11/26/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Jenkins, Andrew)
November 1, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment by Plaintiff Chase Joslin. Responses due by 11/22/2021 (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(kt)
November 1, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Chase Joslin. Replies due by 11/15/2021.(kt)
October 20, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Ada County Misdemeanor Probation Department, Dianna Stephanie Arce-Chinchilla, and Chase Joslin re #1 Complaint, #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 12/20/2021. (kt)
October 20, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigants of the Summary Judgment Rule Requirement (kt)
October 20, 2021 Filing 10 *DISREGARD* NOTICE to Pro Se Litigants of Civil Rule 5.5 Protection of Personal Privacy in Regard to E-Government Act of 2002 sent to Plaintiff, re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (kt) Modified on 10/20/2021 per corrective entry(kt).
October 20, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim Andrew Jenkins appearing for Defendants Ada County Misdemeanor Probation Department, Dianna Stephanie Arce-Chinchilla. Responses due by 11/10/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Jenkins, Andrew)
October 20, 2021 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number 10 Notice to Pro Se Litigants re E-Government Act was filed incorrectly in this case. Please DISREGARD.(kt)
October 18, 2021 Filing 8 RETURN MAIL re: #3 Litigation Order undelivered as to Chase Joslin. Order resent to updated address per #7 Notice of Change of Address.(kt)
October 18, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by Chase Joslin (address updated) (kt) (Documents separated on 10/20/2021) (kt)
October 7, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ada County Misdemeanor Probation Department. Ada County Misdemeanor Probation Department served on 9/30/2021, answer due 10/21/2021. (kt)
October 7, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chase Joslin. Dianna Stephanie Arce-Chinchilla served on 9/30/2021, answer due 10/21/2021. (kt)
October 7, 2021 Filing 4 RETURN MAIL undelivered as to Chase Joslin re: #3 Litigation Order. (kt)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/23/2021 11:00 AM before Judge Candy W. Dale. On or before November 16, 2021, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (kt)
September 22, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Ada County Misdemeanor Probation, Dianna Stephanie Arce-Chinchilla. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued)(kmp) Modified to correct spelling on 9/22/2021 (kmp).
September 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ada County Misdemeanor Probation, Dianna Stephanie Arce-Chinchilla Y, filed by Chase Joslin. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(kmp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/22/2021: #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (kmp). Modified to correct spelling on 9/22/2021 (kmp).
September 22, 2021 RECEIPT: cash Fee Received $ 402, receipt # 28609 (kmp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joslin v. Arce-Chinchilla et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chase Joslin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dianna Stephanie Arce-Chinchilla
Represented By: Andrew Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ada County Misdemeanor Probation Department
Represented By: Andrew Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?