Moore v. Ramirez
Defendant: Warden Ramirez
Petitioner: Jimmy C Moore
Case Number: 1:2021cv00396
Filed: October 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Raymond Edward Patricco
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by L LaMont Anderson on behalf of Warden Ramirez (Anderson, L)
November 22, 2021 Filing 10 INITIAL REVIEW ORDER - Petitioners Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Dkt. #1 ) is GRANTED. Petitioners Motion for Appointment of Counsel (Dkt. #3 ), and Motion Requesting Additional Defense Services (Dkt. #7 ), are DENIED without prejudice. Because discovery has not been ordered in this case, Petitioners Motion for Subpoenas Duces Tecum (Dkt. #8 ) is DENIED. The Clerk of Court will serve (via ECF) a copy of the Petition (Dkt. #2 ), along with any attachments, together with a copy of this Order, on L. LaMont Anderson, on behalf of Respondent, at Mr. Andersons registered ECF address. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
November 3, 2021 Filing 9 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jd)
November 1, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for subpoenas by Petitioner Jimmy C Moore. Responses due by 11/22/2021 (jd)
November 1, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION requesting additional defense services by Petitioner Jimmy C Moore. Responses due by 11/22/2021. (jd)
October 15, 2021 Filing 6 Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jimmy C Moore. (Attachments: #1 Cover Page)(jd)
October 4, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Jimmy C Moore Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 12/3/2021. (lm) Modified on 10/4/2021 to correct docket number (km).
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (kmp) Modified on 10/4/2021 to correct docket number (km).
October 4, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Petitioner Jimmy C Moore. Responses due by 10/25/2021 (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(kmp) Modified on 10/4/2021 to correct docket number (km).
October 4, 2021 Filing 2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jimmy C Moore.(kmp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/4/2021: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit, #3 Supplement) (kmp). Modified on 10/4/2021 to correct docket number (km).
October 4, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Jimmy C Moore. Responses due by 10/25/2021 (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(kmp) Modified on 10/4/2021 to correct docket number (km).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jimmy C Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?