Holtslander v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Rene Lynne Holtslander
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2021cv00486
Filed: December 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Nancy Zaragoza on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Zaragoza, Nancy)
January 6, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Joanne P Rodriguez on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Rodriguez, Joanne)
December 13, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Print attached Summons for service.) (jd)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - Petitioners Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Dkt. #3 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
December 9, 2021 Filing 7 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE(jd)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROCEDURAL ORDER SOCIAL SECURITY. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
December 9, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Rene Lynne Holtslander and counsel for Kilolo Kijakazi re #1 Petition for Review. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 12/30/2021. (jd)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (jd)
December 8, 2021 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Barbara F Harper appearing for Plaintiff Rene Lynne Holtslander. Responses due by 12/29/2021 (Harper, Barbara)
December 8, 2021 Filing 2 Statement of Social Security Number by Rene Lynne Holtslander This is a sealed document.. (Harper, Barbara)
December 8, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REVIEW , filed by Rene Lynne Holtslander. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Harper, Barbara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holtslander v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rene Lynne Holtslander
Represented By: Barbara F Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?