Micron Technology, Inc., et al. v. Longhorn IP, LLC
Plaintiff: Micron Technology, Inc., Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc. and Micron Technology Texas, LLC
Defendant: Longhorn IP, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv00273
Filed: July 5, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Referring Judge: Raymond Edward Patricco
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1446 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 A REQUEST FOR ASSIGNMENT TO A DISTRICT JUDGE HAS BEEN FILED IN THIS CASE(jd)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION for Bond filed by Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc., Micron Technology Texas, LLC, Micron Technology, Inc..Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/26/2022.(Tessar, Amanda)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Longhorn IP, LLC.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Duke, Keely)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION for Bond filed by Longhorn IP, LLC. Replies due by 8/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M)(Duke, Keely)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving dkt. #33 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Amy E. Simpson for Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc., Amy E. Simpson for Micron Technology Texas, LLC, Amy E. Simpson for Micron Technology, Inc. Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ac)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Amy E. Simpson. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number BIDDC-2433482.)Daniel Graham appearing for Plaintiffs Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc., Micron Technology Texas, LLC, Micron Technology, Inc.. Responses due by 8/30/2022 (Graham, Daniel)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. The Court HEREBY ORDERS: Longhorn's Motion to Stay Bond Proceedings (Dkt. #21 ) is DENIED. Briefing on pending motions shall proceed according to the current schedule. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (km)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER - Pending before the Court is Micron's Motion to Seal. Dkt. #16 . Micron correctly filed the document under seal (Dkt. #17 ). The Motion to Seal is unopposed. (Dkt. #30 ). Because the exhibit is unopposed and contains a confidential settlement agreement, the Court sees good cause to GRANT the Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jdg)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE by Longhorn IP, LLC re #16 MOTION to Seal Exhibit 36 (Dkt. No. 15-39) to Its Memorandum in Support of Its Motion for Bond Pursuant to Idaho Code 48-1707 Notice of Non Objection (Duke, Keely)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re #21 MOTION to Stay re #3 MOTION for Bond, #15 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,,, filed by Longhorn IP, LLC.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/5/2022.(Duke, Keely)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 RESPONSE to Motion re #21 MOTION to Stay re #3 MOTION for Bond, #15 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,,, filed by Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc., Micron Technology Texas, LLC, Micron Technology, Inc.. Replies due by 8/17/2022.(Graham, Daniel)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Scott W. Breedlove for Longhorn IP, LLC. Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ac)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc., Micron Technology Texas, LLC, Micron Technology, Inc.. Replies due by 8/15/2022.(Graham, Daniel)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Scott W. Breedlove. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2429458.)Keely E. Duke appearing for Defendant Longhorn IP, LLC. Responses due by 8/22/2022 (Duke, Keely)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER. The Motion (Dkt. #22 ) is GRANTED. Micron shall respond to Longhorns Motion to Stay on or before 4:00 p.m. on August 3, 2022, and any reply by Longhorn shall be filed on or before 4:00 p.m. on August 4, 2022. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (km)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #21 MOTION to Stay . Responses due by 8/3/2022 Replies due by 8/4/2022. (km)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE by Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc., Micron Technology Texas, LLC, Micron Technology, Inc. re #22 MOTION to Expedite Motion to Expedite Briefing Re Motion to Stay Bond Notice of Non-Opposition (Graham, Daniel)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION to Expedite Motion to Expedite Briefing Re Motion to Stay Bond Keely E. Duke appearing for Defendant Longhorn IP, LLC. Responses due by 8/18/2022 (Duke, Keely)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION to Stay re #3 MOTION for Bond, #15 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,,, Keely E. Duke appearing for Defendant Longhorn IP, LLC. Responses due by 8/18/2022 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Duke, Keely)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Trevor Jonathan Bervik for Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc., Micron Technology Texas, LLC, and Micron Technology, Inc. Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (km)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Trevor J. Bervik. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2425000.)Daniel Graham appearing for Plaintiffs Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc., Micron Technology Texas, LLC, Micron Technology, Inc.. Responses due by 8/12/2022 (Graham, Daniel)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Amanda Tessar for Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc.,Amanda Tessar for Micron Technology Texas, LLC,Amanda Tessar for Micron Technology, Inc. Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ac)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Sealed Document Re: #16 MOTION to Seal Exhibit 36 (Dkt. No. 15-39) to Its Memorandum in Support of Its Motion for Bond Pursuant to Idaho Code 48-1707. (Graham, Daniel)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Seal Exhibit 36 (Dkt. No. 15-39) to Its Memorandum in Support of Its Motion for Bond Pursuant to Idaho Code 48-1707 Daniel Graham appearing for Plaintiffs Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc., Micron Technology Texas, LLC, Micron Technology, Inc.. Responses due by 8/11/2022 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Graham, Daniel)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION for Bond Pursuant to Idaho Code 48-1707 filed by Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc., Micron Technology Texas, LLC, Micron Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of David Westergard in Support of Motion for Bond, #2 Affidavit Declaration of William Rodney Stephenson in Support of Motion for Bond, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Daniel Graham in Support of Motion for Bond, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18, #22 Exhibit 19, #23 Exhibit 20, #24 Exhibit 21, #25 Exhibit 22, #26 Exhibit 23, #27 Exhibit 24, #28 Exhibit 25, #29 Exhibit 26, #30 Exhibit 27, #31 Exhibit 28, #32 Exhibit 29, #33 Exhibit 30, #34 Exhibit 31, #35 Exhibit 32, #36 Exhibit 33, #37 Exhibit 34, #38 Exhibit 35, #39 Exhibit 36)(Graham, Daniel)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc., Micron Technology Texas, LLC, Micron Technology, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for Micron Technology, Inc.; Corporate Parent Micron Technology, Inc. for Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc., Micron Technology Texas, LLC. (Graham, Daniel)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Amanda Tessar. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2424315.)Daniel Graham appearing for Plaintiffs Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc., Micron Technology Texas, LLC, Micron Technology, Inc.. Responses due by 8/11/2022 (Graham, Daniel)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Graham on behalf of Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc., Micron Technology Texas, LLC, Micron Technology, Inc. (Graham, Daniel)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Nathan I. Cox for Longhorn IP, LLC Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ac)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE by Longhorn IP, LLC Notice of Constitutional Challenge to a Statute Pursuant to Rule 5.1(a) (Duke, Keely)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Nathan Cox. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2421747.)Keely E. Duke appearing for Defendant Longhorn IP, LLC. Responses due by 8/5/2022 (Duke, Keely)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER In its Motion to Set Bond (Dkt. 3), Plaintiff Micron Technology, Inc., et al., ("Micron"), asserts it will file its Memorandum in support of the Motion to Set Bond within two weeks of the hearing on the Motion. The Court does not set hearings until a motion has been fully briefed, and may also decide a motion on the record and without oral argument. Dist. Idaho Loc. Civ. R. 7.1(d)(1)(B). Further, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7.1, each motion must be accompanied by a separate brief, not to exceed twenty (20) pages, containing all of the reasons and points and authorities relied upon by the moving party. Dist. Idaho Loc. Civ. R. 7.1(b)(1). Micron's proposed procedure is accordingly improper. As such, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: Micron shall file its Memorandum in support of the Motion to Set Bond on or before July 27, 2022, with the regular briefing schedule to follow. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (nt)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Keely E. Duke appearing for Defendant Longhorn IP, LLC. Responses due by 8/2/2022 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Duke, Keely)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Longhorn IP, LLC, and counsel for Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc., Micron Technology Texas, LLC, Micron Technology, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 9/6/2022. (jd)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David C. Nye for all further proceedings. Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr no longer assigned to case. Approved by Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DISREGARD - NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Longhorn IP, LLC, and counsel fo Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc., Micron Technology Texas, LLC, Micron Technology, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 9/6/2022. (jd) Modified on 7/6/2022, see corrective entry (jd).
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #4 Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline, was filed incorrectly in this case. Please disregard.(jd)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jd)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Micron's MOTION for Bond by Daniel A Graham and David T Krueck appearing for Plaintiffs Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc., Micron Technology Texas, LLC and Micron Technology, Inc. Responses due by 7/27/2022. (jd)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - All Plaintiffs. (service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (jd)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Longhorn IP, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Tanit Ventures, inc. for Longhorn IP, LLC. (Duke, Keely)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Longhorn IP, LLC from Ada County, case number CV01-22-08130.(Filing fee $402 receipt numberAIDDC-2416659.), filed by Longhorn IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Keely E. Duke, #3 Exhibit A-Docket, #4 Exhibit B1-Complaint, #5 Exhibit B2-Summons, #6 Exhibit B3-Mtn for Bond, #7 Exhibit B4-Pro Hac Motion, #8 Exhibit B5-Order Granting Pro Hac, #9 Exhibit B6-Notice of Service, #10 Exhibit B-7 Notice of Hearing, #11 Exhibit C-Longhorn Certificate, #12 Exhibit D-Tanit Public Info, #13 Exhibit E-Micron Articles, #14 Exhibit F-Micron Amended Articles, #15 Exhibit G-Micron Corporate Discl)(Duke, Keely)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Micron Technology, Inc., et al. v. Longhorn IP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micron Technology, Inc.
Represented By: David T Krueck
Represented By: Amanda Tessar
Represented By: Amy E. Simpson
Represented By: Daniel Graham
Represented By: Trevor Jonathan Bervik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc.
Represented By: David T Krueck
Represented By: Amy E. Simpson
Represented By: Amanda Tessar
Represented By: Daniel Graham
Represented By: Trevor Jonathan Bervik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micron Technology Texas, LLC
Represented By: David T Krueck
Represented By: Amanda Tessar
Represented By: Amy E. Simpson
Represented By: Daniel Graham
Represented By: Trevor Jonathan Bervik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Longhorn IP, LLC
Represented By: Keely E. Duke
Represented By: Nathan I. Cox
Represented By: Scott W. Breedlove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?