Damon v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Douglas Leigh Damon
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2022cv00328
Filed: August 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Debora K Grasham
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Eric Staples on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Staples, Jeffrey)
September 23, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Gealy England on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (England, Christine)
August 2, 2022 Filing 6 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE(alw)
August 2, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi, SSA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Print attached Summons for service.) (ac)
August 2, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Douglas Leigh Damon re #1 Petition for Review. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 8/23/2022. (ac)
August 2, 2022 Filing 3 PROCEDURAL ORDER SOCIAL SECURITY (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ac)
August 1, 2022 Filing 2 Statement of Social Security Number by Douglas Leigh Damon This is a sealed document.. (Harper, Barbara)
August 1, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REVIEW (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIDDC-2429438.), filed by Douglas Leigh Damon. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Harper, Barbara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Damon v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Leigh Damon
Represented By: Barbara F Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?