Van Hook v. Winmill, et al.
Plaintiff: Ronald Van Hook
Defendant: Judge Winmill, A.A and the Clerk's Office, State of Idaho, Idaho Deputy Attorney General Robert Berry, All members of the Idaho Supreme Court and Payette County District Court Judge Susan Wiebe
Case Number: 1:2022cv00347
Filed: August 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Raymond Edward Patricco
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2022 Filing 25 Response to State Defendants Reply re #15 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Ronald Van Hook. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(alw)
October 5, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE to the court, grievance, address discrepancy by Ronald Van Hook (Attachments: #1 certificate of service, #2 envelope)(alw)
October 3, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for All members of the Idaho Supreme Court, Payette County District Court Judge Susan Wiebe re #21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 12/2/2022. (alw)
October 3, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigants of the Summary Judgment Rule Requirement re #21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (alw)
September 30, 2022 Filing 21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim John R Goodell appearing for Defendants All members of the Idaho Supreme Court, Payette County District Court Judge Susan Wiebe. Responses due by 10/21/2022 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Goodell, John)
September 28, 2022 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronald Van Hook. All members of the Idaho Supreme Court served on 9/13/2022, answer due 10/4/2022; Idaho Deputy Attorney General Robert Berry served on 9/13/2022, answer due 10/4/2022. (alw)
September 28, 2022 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Ronald Van Hook. (alw)
September 28, 2022 Filing 18 Request for leave to add defendants by Plaintiff Ronald Van Hook. Responses due by 10/19/2022 (Attachments: #1 envelope)(alw)
September 26, 2022 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION for Leave to File filed by Idaho Deputy Attorney General Robert Berry, State of Idaho. Replies due by 10/11/2022.(Reed, Dayton)
September 26, 2022 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Take Judicial Notice Non-Opposition to Motion to Take Judicial Notice filed by Idaho Deputy Attorney General Robert Berry, State of Idaho. Replies due by 10/11/2022.(Reed, Dayton)
September 26, 2022 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Idaho Deputy Attorney General Robert Berry, State of Idaho.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/27/2022.(Reed, Dayton)
September 12, 2022 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ronald Van Hook. Replies due by 9/26/2022.(jd)
September 12, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to Take Judicial Notice by Plaintiff Ronald Van Hook. Responses due by 10/3/2022. (jd)
September 12, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to bring a complaint against Robert Berry by Plaintiff Ronald Van Hook. Responses due by 10/3/2022. (jd)
September 12, 2022 Filing 11 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jd)
September 9, 2022 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to All members of the Idaho Supreme Court, Idaho Deputy Attorney General Robert Berry, Payette County District Court Judge Susan Wiebe. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(alw)
September 8, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Service by Ronald Van Hook (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 envelope)(alw)
September 8, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Substitution - Attorney Dayton Patrick Reed for Idaho Deputy Attorney General Robert Berry,Dayton Patrick Reed for State of Idaho added. Attorney Keegan Charles August Hahn terminated. Request to Turn Electronic Noticing OFF (no longer receive NEFs in this case only) by Attorney (Hahn, Keegan)
September 8, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigants of the Summary Judgment Rule Requirement re #3 MOTION to Dismiss (alw)
September 6, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Idaho Deputy Attorney General Robert Berry, State of Idaho, Ronald Van Hook re #1 Complaint, #3 MOTION to Dismiss Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 11/7/2022. (lm)
September 2, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Keegan Charles August Hahn appearing for Defendants Idaho Deputy Attorney General Robert Berry, State of Idaho. Responses due by 9/23/2022 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Hahn, Keegan)
August 30, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE by Ronald Van Hook (alw)
August 30, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE by Ronald Van Hook (alw)
August 12, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Ronald Van Hook. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons Idaho Attorney General)(kmc)
August 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Y, filed by Ronald Van Hook. (Attachments: #1 Brief to accompany complaint, #2 Exhibit EEEE, #3 Exhibit EEEEE, #4 Exhibit QQQQ, #5 Exhibit QQQQQ)(kmc)
August 12, 2022 RECEIPT: check Fee Received $ 402.00, receipt # 30228 (kmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Hook v. Winmill, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Van Hook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Winmill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.A and the Clerk's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Idaho
Represented By: Dayton Patrick Reed
Represented By: Keegan Charles August Hahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Idaho Deputy Attorney General Robert Berry
Represented By: Dayton Patrick Reed
Represented By: Keegan Charles August Hahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All members of the Idaho Supreme Court
Represented By: John R Goodell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Payette County District Court Judge Susan Wiebe
Represented By: John R Goodell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?