Florer v. Ford Motor Service Company Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Scott Florer
Defendant: Ford Motor Service Company Inc., Lithia Motors Support Services Inc., James D. Farley, Jr., Lisa Drake, Bryan Deboer, Chris Holtzshu, Rhett Sheeder, Rich Stuart, Angelo Sanchez, Travis Stear and Lisa Crabtree
Case Number: 1:2022cv00449
Filed: October 26, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Debora K Grasham
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. Plaintiffs Motion for CM/ECF Access (Dkt. 2 ) is GRANTED. The Court will consider Plaintiffs Certificate of Service (Dkt. #4 ) to have been properly filed with the Court on November 9, 2022. Plaintiffs Motion to Hold Case in Abaynce [sic] (Dkt. #11 ) is DENIED. Plaintiff will have twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order to respond to Defendants Motion to Dismiss. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Debora K Grasham. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Lithia Motors, Inc.. Responses due by 1/3/2023 (alw)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to hold case in abeyance by Plaintiff Scott Florer. Responses due by 1/3/2023 (Attachments: #1 envelope)(alw)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigants of the Summary Judgment Rule Requirement re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Lithia Motors, Inc. (alw)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Status Report by Scott Florer (Attachments: #1 envelope)(alw)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #4 Certificate of Counsel filed by Scott Florer was filed incorrectly in this case. Plaintiff's motion has not been granted yet, therefore he cannot e-file. (alw)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT in Support by Phillip J. Collaer re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Lithia Motors, Inc. filed by Lithia Motors Support Services Inc..(Collaer, Phillip)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Lithia Motors, Inc. of Edward Impert filed by Lithia Motors Support Services Inc..(Collaer, Phillip)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Lithia Motors, Inc. filed by Lithia Motors Support Services Inc..(Collaer, Phillip)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Lithia Motors, Inc. Phillip J Collaer appearing for Defendant Lithia Motors Support Services Inc.. Responses due by 12/27/2022 (Collaer, Phillip)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #3 Litigation Order, by Dennis Scott Florer, I on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Florer, Dennis)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 1/4/2023 01:00 PM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Chambers before US Magistrate Judge Debora K Grasham. On or before December 28, 2022, the parties must file with the Court the jointLitigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Debora K Grasham. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 CIVIL COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Scott Florer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Florer Declaration)(ac)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order RECEIPT: Cash Fee Received $ 402.00, receipt # 30572 (ac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Florer v. Ford Motor Service Company Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Florer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Service Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lithia Motors Support Services Inc.
Represented By: Phillip J Collaer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James D. Farley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Deboer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Holtzshu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhett Sheeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rich Stuart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angelo Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Stear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Crabtree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?