Terry v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Randall Wayne Terry
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2022cv00505
Filed: December 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - ORDERED that that the Motion (Dkt. #8 ) is GRANTED, and Defendant shall have up to and including March 15, 2023, to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Candy W Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
February 10, 2023 Filing 10 ERRATA by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi re #9 Declaration Heidi L. Triesch. (Triesch, Heidi)
February 10, 2023 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Heidi L. Triesch re #8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint for Review of Social Security UNOPPOSED filed by Kilolo Kijakazi . (Triesch, Heidi)
February 10, 2023 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint for Review of Social Security UNOPPOSED Heidi Triesch appearing for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. Responses due by 3/3/2023 (Triesch, Heidi)
December 30, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Heidi Triesch on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Triesch, Heidi)
December 19, 2022 Filing 6 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE(jd)
December 16, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Kilolo Kijakazi and Randall Wayne Terry re #1 Complaint for Review of Social Security. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 1/6/2023. (jd)
December 16, 2022 Filing 4 Notice of Filing of Complaint seeking review under 42 U.S.C. 405(g)- caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PROCEDURAL ORDER SOCIAL SECURITY. Signed by Judge Candy W Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
December 16, 2022 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number [1-1] Summons filed by Randall Wayne Terry was filed incorrectly in this case. Pursuant to the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Review Actions Under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), the plaintiff need not serve a summons and complaint; therefore, the attached summons will not be issued. (jd)
December 15, 2022 Filing 2 Statement of Social Security Number by Randall Wayne Terry This is a sealed document.. (Harper, Barbara)
December 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR REVIEW OF SOCIAL SECURITY (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIDDC-2493190.), filed by Randall Wayne Terry. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet)(Harper, Barbara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terry v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Wayne Terry
Represented By: Barbara F Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Heidi Triesch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?