Christesen v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Merecedes Dawn Christesen
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2022cv00525
Filed: December 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Debora K Grasham
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME - The transcript will be due on or before March 27, 2023. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Debora K Grasham. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
February 17, 2023 Filing 14 DECLARATION of L. Jamala Edwards re #13 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint for Review of Social Security Unopposed filed by Kilolo Kijakazi . (Edwards, L.)
February 17, 2023 Filing 13 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint for Review of Social Security Unopposed L. Jamala Edwards appearing for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. Responses due by 3/10/2023 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Edwards, L.)
February 15, 2023 Filing 12 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Barbara F Harper appearing for Plaintiff Merecedes Dawn Christesen. Responses due by 3/8/2023 (Harper, Barbara)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE PLAINTIFF'S RENEWED IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION - In consideration of the same and good cause appearing therefor, the Court hereby GRANTS Plaintiffs Motion. Plaintiffs Renewed will be due on or before February 20, 2023. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Debora K Grasham. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
February 6, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Renewed In Forma Pauperis Application Barbara F Harper appearing for Plaintiff Merecedes Dawn Christesen. Responses due by 2/27/2023 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Barbara Harper)(Harper, Barbara)
January 17, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by L. Jamala Edwards on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Edwards, L.)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - Plaintiffs In Forma Pauperis Application (Dkt. #2 ) is DENIED. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Debora K Grasham. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
December 28, 2022 Filing 7 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE(jd)
December 28, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Merecedes Dawn Christesen and counsel for Kilolo Kijakazi re #1 Complaint for Review of Social Security. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 1/18/2023. (jd)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER of Conditional Filing - caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
December 28, 2022 Filing 4 PROCEDURAL ORDER SOCIAL SECURITY. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Debora K Grasham. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
December 27, 2022 Filing 3 Statement of Social Security Number by Merecedes Dawn Christesen This is a sealed document.. (Harper, Barbara)
December 27, 2022 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Barbara F Harper appearing for Plaintiff Merecedes Dawn Christesen. Responses due by 1/17/2023 (Harper, Barbara)
December 27, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR REVIEW OF SOCIAL SECURITY , filed by Merecedes Dawn Christesen. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Harper, Barbara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christesen v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merecedes Dawn Christesen
Represented By: Barbara F Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: L. Jamala Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?