Micron Technology, Inc. et al v. Netlist, Inc.
Plaintiff: Micron Technology, Inc. and Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc.
Defendant: Netlist, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2024cv00001
Filed: January 2, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Debora K Grasham
Referring Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Sealed Document Re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Transfer. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of R. Carrizosa, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y)(Donahey, Teague)
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION to Seal Teague Ian Donahey appearing for Plaintiffs Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc., Micron Technology, Inc.. Responses due by 3/20/2024 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Donahey, Teague)
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion re #17 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Transfer filed by Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc., Micron Technology, Inc.. Replies due by 3/13/2024. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of R. Carrizosa, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Slipsheet for Exs. B-Y, #4 Affidavit Declaration of J. Lang, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6)(Donahey, Teague)
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Remand filed by Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc., Micron Technology, Inc..Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/23/2024.(Donahey, Teague)
February 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Remand filed by Netlist, Inc.. Replies due by 2/22/2024.(Martin, James)
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Transfer James L Martin appearing for Defendant Netlist, Inc.. Responses due by 2/28/2024 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Tobin Hobbs)(Martin, James)
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 A REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT TO A DISTRICT JUDGE HAS BEEN FILED IN THIS CASE(lm)
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Judge David C. Nye for all further proceedings. US Magistrate Judge Debora K Grasham no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 1:24-cv-00001-DCN (lm)
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER APPROVING (Dkt. #13 ) Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Kim B. Goldberg for Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc.,Kim B. Goldberg for Micron Technology, Inc. Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lm)
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Remand Teague Ian Donahey appearing for Plaintiffs Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc., Micron Technology, Inc.. Responses due by 2/8/2024 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Donahey, Teague)
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Kim B. Goldberg. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2689930.)Teague Ian Donahey appearing for Plaintiff Micron Technology, Inc.. Responses due by 2/8/2024 (Donahey, Teague)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER APPROVING (Dkt. #10 , #11 ) Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Michael Harbour and Andrew Henderson for Netlist, Inc. Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk). Signed by US Magistrate Judge Debora K Grasham. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lm)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Andrew Henderson. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2687981.)James L Martin appearing for Defendant Netlist, Inc.. Responses due by 2/6/2024 (Martin, James)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Michael D. Harbour. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2687978.)James L Martin appearing for Defendant Netlist, Inc.. Responses due by 2/6/2024 (Martin, James)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER APPROVING (Dkt. #7 & #8 ) Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Jared Bobrow,Jason Lang for Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc and Micron Technology, Inc. Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lm)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Jason Lang. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2683958.)Teague Ian Donahey appearing for Plaintiff Micron Technology, Inc.. Responses due by 1/29/2024 (Donahey, Teague)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Jared Bobrow. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2683952.)Teague Ian Donahey appearing for Plaintiff Micron Technology, Inc.. Responses due by 1/29/2024 (Donahey, Teague)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME - The Stipulation for Extension of Time (Dkt. #5 ) is GRANTED, and Defendant Netlist, Inc. has until January 30, 2024 to respond to the Complaint in this action. filed by Netlist, Inc. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Debora K Grasham. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lm)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION for Extension of Time by Netlist, Inc.. (Martin, James)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Micron Technology, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Micron Technology Inc, Other Affiliate Micron Semiconductor Products Inc for Micron Technology, Inc.. (Donahey, Teague)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Netlist, Inc.. (Martin, James)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc., Micron Technology, Inc., Netlist, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 3/4/2024. (lm)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order DOCKET TEXT NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (lm)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - All Defendants. (no service document on file, service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (lm)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Netlist, Inc. from Fourth Judicial District, Ada County, case number CV01-23-19920.(Filing fee $405 receipt numberAIDDC-2681648.), filed by Netlist, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summons, #3 Exhibit B - State Court Complaint, #4 Exhibit C - State Court Docket, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Martin, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Micron Technology, Inc. et al v. Netlist, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micron Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher C McCurdy
Represented By: Teague Ian Donahey
Represented By: Jason Lang
Represented By: Kim B. Goldberg
Represented By: Jared Bobrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher C McCurdy
Represented By: Teague Ian Donahey
Represented By: Kim B. Goldberg
Represented By: Jared Bobrow
Represented By: Jason Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netlist, Inc.
Represented By: James L Martin
Represented By: Landon Scott Brown
Represented By: Andrew Henderson
Represented By: Michael Harbour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?