Heil Trailer International, LLC v. Transquip LLC et al
Plaintiff: Heil Trailer International, LLC d/b/a Kalyn Siebert and Heil Trailer International doing business as Kalyn Siebert
Defendant: Transquip LLC and Michael J Lemrick
Case Number: 1:2024cv00032
Filed: January 19, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Raymond Edward Patricco
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2024 Filing 11 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER granting #10 Unopposed Motion to Stay. All deadlines in the action are stayed until April 8, 2024. Unless the stay is extended, Defendants' deadline to answer the complaint will be April 9, 2024. Plaintiff shall serve Defendants' counsel with a copy of this order. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Raymond E. Patricco, Jr. (aj)
March 7, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay Deadlines Pending Settlement Matthew W. Cornelia appearing for Plaintiff Heil Trailer International. Responses due by 3/28/2024 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cornelia, Matthew)
March 6, 2024 DISREGARD ENTERED IN ERROR RECEIPT: PAID IN FULL Fee Received $ 405.00, receipt # 100051016 0.00 (ch) Modified on 3/7/2024 Filing fee has already been paid. This receipt was entered incorrectly(lm).
February 12, 2024 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Heil Trailer International. Michael J Lemrick served on 2/2/2024, answer due 2/23/2024. (Pittman, Nathan)
February 12, 2024 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Heil Trailer International. Transquip LLC served on 2/2/2024, answer due 2/23/2024. (Pittman, Nathan)
February 5, 2024 Filing 7 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER APPROVING (Dkt. #5 & #6 ) Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Matthew W. Cornelia,Claire Hagan Eller for Heil Trailer International Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk); (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lm)
February 2, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Claire Hagan Eller. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2699668.)Nathan Pittman appearing for Plaintiff Heil Trailer International. Responses due by 2/23/2024 (Pittman, Nathan)
February 2, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Matthew W. Cornelia. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2699658.)Nathan Pittman appearing for Plaintiff Heil Trailer International. Responses due by 2/23/2024 (Pittman, Nathan)
January 22, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Michael J Lemrick, Transquip LLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(lm)
January 22, 2024 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s)98113825, 98113827, 98113833, 98113835 (Notice sent to USPTO) (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (lm)
January 19, 2024 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Heil Trailer International, LLC d/b/a Kalyn Siebert identifying Corporate Parent EnTrans Holdings L.P., Corporate Parent EnTrans International LLC for Heil Trailer International, LLC d/b/a Kalyn Siebert. (Pittman, Nathan)
January 19, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael J Lemrick, Transquip LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AIDDC-2690446.), filed by Heil Trailer International, LLC d/b/a Kalyn Siebert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Cover Sheet, #19 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark, #20 Summons Transquip, #21 Summons Michael J. Lemrick)(Pittman, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heil Trailer International, LLC v. Transquip LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heil Trailer International, LLC d/b/a Kalyn Siebert
Represented By: Nathan Pittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heil Trailer International doing business as Kalyn Siebert
Represented By: Nathan Pittman
Represented By: Claire Hagan Eller
Represented By: Matthew W. Cornelia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transquip LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J Lemrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?