Taylor v. Commissioner of Social Security
Petitioner: Kyle Steven Taylor
Respondent: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2024cv00144
Filed: March 18, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Administrative Record by Franco Luciano Becia on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6, #6 Part 7, #7 Part 8, #8 Part 9)(Becia, Franco)
March 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DOCKET TEXT NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Franco Luciano Becia appearing for Commissioner of Social Security by Attorney (Becia, Franco)
March 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DOCKET TEXT NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter L Wucetich appearing for Commissioner of Social Security by Attorney (Wucetich, Peter)
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE - Notice of Filing of Complaint seeking review under 42 U.S.C. 405(g)- re #1 Complaint for Review of Social Security. Caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - Plaintiffs In Forma Pauperis Application (Dkt. 2) is GRANTED. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Candy W Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
March 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE(ac)
March 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Commissioner of Social Security, Kyle Steven Taylor re. dkt. #1 Complaint for Review of Social Security. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 4/10/2024. (ac)
March 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER of Conditional Filing - caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ac)
March 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PROCEDURAL ORDER SOCIAL SECURITY. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Candy W Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ac)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Statement of Social Security Number by Kyle Steven Taylor This is a sealed document.. (Parkinson, Brad)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Brad D Parkinson appearing for Petitioner Kyle Steven Taylor. Responses due by 4/8/2024 (Parkinson, Brad)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR REVIEW OF SOCIAL SECURITY , filed by Kyle Steven Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Unfavorable Decision, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Parkinson, Brad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kyle Steven Taylor
Represented By: Brad D Parkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?