Richardson v. Colvin
Plaintiff: Dustin Shane Richardson
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 1:2025cv00018
Filed: January 15, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Raymond Edward Patricco
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2025 Filing 9 Administrative Record by Angela Thornton-Millard on behalf of Carolyn W. Colvin. (Attachments: #1 Court Transcript Index, #2 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, #3 Payment Documents and Decisions, #4 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices Part 1, #5 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices Part 2, #6 Non Disability Related Development, #7 Disability Related Development Part 1, #8 Disability Related Development Part 2, #9 Medical Records Part 1, #10 Medical Records Part 2, #11 Medical Records Part 3, #12 Medical Records Part 4, #13 Medical Records Part 5, #14 Medical Records Part 6, #15 Medical Records Part 7, #16 Medical Records Part 8)(Thornton-Millard, Angela)
February 7, 2025 Filing 8 The 21 day deadline has expired. Case will remain with a Magistrate Judge. No more notice of assignment will be sent out. Consent deadline(s) termed. (hs)
January 27, 2025 Filing 7 DOCKET TEXT NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Angela Thornton-Millard appearing for Commissioner of Social Security by Attorney (Thornton-Millard, Angela)
January 21, 2025 Filing 6 DOCKET TEXT NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter L Wucetich appearing for Commissioner of Social Security by Attorney (Wucetich, Peter)
January 16, 2025 Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent Form sent to counsel for Dustin Shane Richardson re #1 Complaint for Review of Social Security. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 2/6/2025. (hs)
January 16, 2025 Filing 4 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE - Notice of Filing of Complaint seeking review under 42 U.S.C. 405(g)- re #1 Complaint for Review of Social Security. Caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (hs)
January 16, 2025 Filing 3 PROCEDURAL ORDER SOCIAL SECURITY. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (hs)
January 15, 2025 Filing 2 Statement of Social Security Number by Dustin Shane Richardson This is a sealed document.. (Ocampo, Britney)
January 15, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR REVIEW OF SOCIAL SECURITY (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AIDDC-2867889.), filed by Dustin Shane Richardson. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Ocampo, Britney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Represented By: Peter L Wucetich
Represented By: Angela Thornton-Millard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Shane Richardson
Represented By: Britney D Ocampo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?