Peterson v. Colvin
Plaintiff: Gina Peterson
Defendant: Carolyn W Colvin
Case Number: 1:2025cv00049
Filed: January 29, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Debora K Grasham
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2025 Filing 9 Administrative Record by Angela Thornton-Millard on behalf of Carolyn W Colvin. (Thornton-Millard, Angela)
February 25, 2025 Filing 8 AMENDED ORDER re #7 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Debora K Grasham. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
February 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Plaintiffs In Forma Pauperis Application (Dkt. #3 ) is DENIED. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Debora K Grasham. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
February 21, 2025 The 21 day deadline has expired. Case will remain with a Magistrate Judge. No more notice of assignment will be sent out. Consent/Declination deadline(s) termed. (km)
February 20, 2025 Filing 6 DOCKET TEXT NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Angela Thornton-Millard appearing for Commissioner of Social Security by Attorney (Thornton-Millard, Angela)
January 30, 2025 Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent Form sent to counsel for Gina Peterson re #1 Complaint for Review of Social Security. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 2/20/2025. (hs)
January 30, 2025 Filing 4 PROCEDURAL ORDER SOCIAL SECURITY. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Debora K Grasham. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (hs)
January 29, 2025 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Sean Wilson appearing for Plaintiff Gina Peterson. Responses due by 2/19/2025 (Wilson, Sean)
January 29, 2025 Filing 2 Statement of Social Security Number by Gina Peterson This is a sealed document.. (Wilson, Sean)
January 29, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR REVIEW OF SOCIAL SECURITY , filed by Gina Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Wilson, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peterson v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina Peterson
Represented By: Sean Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W Colvin
Represented By: Angela Thornton-Millard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?