Hamilton v. Creech et al
Plaintiff: Norman Hamilton
Defendant: Andy Creech and Barbra Stewart
Case Number: 1:2025cv00098
Filed: February 24, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2025 Filing 11 MOTION for Appointment of Pro Bono Counselby Plaintiff Norman Hamilton. Responses due by 4/21/2025 (hs)
March 31, 2025 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #2 Complaint by Plaintiff Norman Hamilton. Responses due by 4/21/2025 (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hs)
March 7, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL REVIEW ORDER BY SCREENING JUDGE AND ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT - IT IS ORDERED: This case shall be reassigned to a United States District Judge to review for summary dismissal. Plaintiff may file a response to this Order and/or an amended complaint within 30 days after entry of this Order. Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (Dkt. #3 ) is DENIED. Plaintiff has adequately stated his facts and the legal theory of his case. The facts and law are straightforward in this case and do not require appointment of pro bono counsel. Case reassigned to Judge David C. Nye for all further proceedings. US Magistrate Judge Debora K Grasham no longer assigned to case. Please use case number 1:25-cv-00098-DCN for all future filings. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Debora K Grasham. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (hs)
March 7, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS AND WITHDRAWAL OF FILING FEE FROM INMATE TRUST ACCOUNT of Norman Hamilton. (Notice sent to Finance) Plaintiff's Application for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Dkt. #1 ) is GRANTED. The Warden of SRCI or his designee shall collect from Plaintiffs prison trust account the $350.00 balance of the filing fee and shall forward payments to the Clerk of Court. The Clerk of Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on the Warden or his designee. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Debora K Grasham. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (hs)
February 24, 2025 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Oregon; Case Number 2:24-cv-02003. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 21, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff having not shown cause as required by the Order (#5 ) dated 1/14/2025, the Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this case to the District of Idaho pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). Ordered by Judge Adrienne Nelson. **PRINT NEF ONLY** (Norman Hamilton, Prisoner ID: 23371259) (pvh)
January 14, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Should Plaintiff wish to continue with this case in the District of Oregon, within 30 days of the date of this Order he must show cause why venue is proper in the District of Oregon. If he does not do so, the Court will direct the Clerk to transfer this case to the District of Idaho. Signed on 1/14/25 by Judge Adrienne Nelson.**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Norman Hamilton, Prisoner ID: 23371259) (sb)
December 2, 2024 Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Adrienne Nelson. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Norman Hamillton, Prisoner ID: 23371259) (hm)
December 2, 2024 Filing 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Norman Hamillton.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Norman Hamillton, Prisoner ID: 23371259) (hm)
December 2, 2024 Filing 2 Complaint. (IFP Submitted) Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Norman Hamillton against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet).**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Norman Hamillton, Prisoner ID: 23371259) (hm)
December 2, 2024 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Norman Hamillton.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Norman Hamillton, Prisoner ID: 23371259) (hm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamilton v. Creech et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Creech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbra Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?