Perez v. Sandpoint Gas N Go & Lube Center, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Thomas E Perez
Defendant: Sandpoint Gas N Go & Lube Center, Inc. and Sydney M Oskoui
Case Number: 2:2014cv00357
Filed: August 27, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Office: CDA - Northern Office
County: Bonner - Northern
Presiding Judge: B. Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 29:651
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. Defendants Motion to Vacate (Dkt. 97 ) is DENIED. 2. Defendants Motion to Disqualify (Dkt. 105 ) is DENIED. 3. Plaintiffs Motion for Judgment Debtor Exam (Dkt. 103 ) is GRANTED. a. Sydney M. Oskoui shall appear for a judgment debtor examination in the Jury Assembly Room at the United States Courthouse for the District of Idaho, Coeur dAlene Office, 6450 North Mineral Drive, Coeur d'Alene ID 83815. b. Counsel for Plaintiff shall sub mit 2-3 proposed dates and times for the exam to the Court within 14 days of the date of this Order. The Court will choose one of those dates and times, and then issue a separate Order setting the date and time of the exam.... Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER It is hereby ORDERED, that the defendants are found in contempt of court (civil) for their failure to pay the sums set forth in the Memorandum Decision and Order (docket no. 95 ), and for their failure to appear for the examination on August 9, 2018. It is further ORDERED, that the Government shall submit to the Court a brief addressing the Court's authority to issue sanctions, including further monetary sanctions and an arrest warrant. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Defendant's Motion to Stay and Brief in Support (Dkt. 85 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - 1. Defendants Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Dkt. 73 ) is DENIED. 2. Defendants Motion to Set Aside Default (Dkt. 74 ) is DENIED. 3. Defendants Request for District Court to Consider or Grant Defendants Motion to Set Aside Default (Dkt. 80 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 AMENDED ORDER re 54 Order. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Plaintiff's Verified Request for Clerk's Entry of Default (Dkt. 5 ) is GRANTED. Defendant Sydney Oskoui's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 6 ) is DENIED. Defendant Sydney Oskoui's Second Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 12 ) is DENIED. Defendant Sydney Oskoui's Motion for Sanctions (Dkt. 22 ) is DENIED. The Clerk of the Court shall enter default in favor of Plaintiff and against each defendant. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER, Defendant Sandpoint Gas N Go & Lube Center, Inc. shall, within 21 days of receiving this Order, appoint an attorney to appear on its behalf, as the entity cannot appear without being represented by an attorney pursuant to Dist. Idaho Loc. Civ. R. 83.4(d). If an attorney for Sandpoint fails to appear within the 21 day period allowed by this Order, such failure will be sufficient grounds for entry of a default against Sandpoint. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond (Dkt. 8 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file its response to the motion to dismiss on or before 11/7/14. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. Sandpoint Gas N Go & Lube Center, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandpoint Gas N Go & Lube Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sydney M Oskoui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas E Perez
Represented By: Evan Hansen Nordby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?