Hermann v. Stimson Lumber Co
Plaintiff: Fred D Hermann
Defendant: Stimson Lumber Co
Case Number: 2:2018cv00462
Filed: October 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Stimson Lumber Co.(Leachman, Tamsen)
December 10, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Stimson Lumber Co. (Angeli, Courtney)
November 19, 2018 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #3 Summons Returned Executed filed by Fred D Hermann was filed incorrectly in this case. The wrong service date of 10/31/2018 was entered when the actual service date is 11/1/2018.No action is needed by the filing party. The Clerk's Office will edit the entry and reset the answer deadline from 11/21/2018 to 11/23/2018.(cjs)
November 19, 2018 Filing 5 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Courtney Angeli for Stimson Lumber Co. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
November 16, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Courtney Angeli. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1812327.)Tamsen L Leachman appearing for Defendant Stimson Lumber Co. Responses due by 12/7/2018 (Leachman, Tamsen)
November 15, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fred D Hermann. Stimson Lumber Co served on 11/1/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (Haynes, Robin) Modified on 11/19/2018 per Corrective Entry (cjs).
October 24, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Stimson Lumber Co. (Print attached Summons for service.) (cjs)
October 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stimson Lumber Co ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1801396.), filed by Fred D Hermann. (Attachments: #1 Summons Stimson, #2 Cover Sheet)(Haynes, Robin) Modified on 10/24/2018 to edit text (cjs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hermann v. Stimson Lumber Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred D Hermann
Represented By: Robin Lynn Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stimson Lumber Co
Represented By: Tamsen L Leachman
Represented By: Courtney Angeli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?