Garrigan v. DMB Financial, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Wayne Garrigan
Defendant: DMB Financial, LLC and Commonwealth Serving Group
Case Number: 2:2018cv00485
Filed: November 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:153
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Filing 10 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER Approving #7 Application for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Stefan Coleman for Wayne Garrigan. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
December 6, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Commonwealth Serving Group, DMB Financial, LLC, Wayne Garrigan re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , #1 Complaint, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 2/4/2019. (jp)
December 5, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Paul D. McFarlane appearing for Defendants Commonwealth Serving Group, DMB Financial, LLC. Responses due by 12/26/2018 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Motion to Extend)(McFarlane, Paul)
December 4, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1819528.)James M Bendell appearing for Plaintiff Wayne Garrigan. Responses due by 12/25/2018 (Bendell, James)
November 28, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wayne Garrigan. Commonwealth Serving Group served on 11/15/2018, answer due 12/6/2018. (Bendell, James)
November 28, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wayne Garrigan. DMB Financial, LLC served on 11/15/2018, answer due 12/6/2018. (Bendell, James)
November 28, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wayne Garrigan. DMB Financial, LLC served on 11/13/2018, answer due 12/4/2018. (Bendell, James)
November 28, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wayne Garrigan. Commonwealth Serving Group served on 11/13/2018, answer due 12/4/2018. (Bendell, James)
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Commonwealth Serving Group, DMB Financial, LLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(jp)
November 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wayne Garrigan ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1807756.), filed by Wayne Garrigan. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Class Action, #2 Summons Summons, #3 Summons Summons, #4 Cover Sheet Cover Sheet)(Bendell, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garrigan v. DMB Financial, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DMB Financial, LLC
Represented By: Paul D. McFarlane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Serving Group
Represented By: Paul D. McFarlane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Garrigan
Represented By: James M Bendell
Represented By: Stefan Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?