Resort Aviation Services, Inc. v. Kootenai County et al
Plaintiff: Resort Aviation Services, Inc.
Defendant: Kootenai County and Kootenai County Board of Commissioners
Case Number: 2:2019cv00133
Filed: April 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 12 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Resort Aviation Services, Inc.. (Daugharty, Paul)
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 DISCOVERY PLAN by Resort Aviation Services, Inc. . (Daugharty, Paul)
June 10, 2019 Filing 10 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (alw)
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Kootenai County, Kootenai County Board of Commissioners, Resort Aviation Services, Inc. re #8 Answer to Complaint, #1 Complaint, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 8/5/2019. (jp)
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Demand for Jury Trial by Kootenai County, Kootenai County Board of Commissioners.(Erbland, Peter)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Resort Aviation Services, Inc. Kty Cty Board of Commisisoners (Daugharty, Paul)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Resort Aviation Services, Inc. Kootenai County (Daugharty, Paul)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. On or before 6/19/19, the parties must file with the Court the jointLitigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 6/26/2019 11:00 AM in Boise Chambers before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Resort Aviation Services, Inc.. (Daugharty, Paul)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter C Erbland on behalf of Kootenai County, Kootenai County Board of Commissioners (Erbland, Peter)
April 23, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Kootenai County, Kootenai County Board of Commissioners. (Print attached Summons for service.) (cjs)
April 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial against Resort Aviation Services, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1876036.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Daugharty, Paul) (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/23/2019) (cjs). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/23/2019: #3 Exhibit A, B & C) (cjs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Resort Aviation Services, Inc. v. Kootenai County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kootenai County
Represented By: Peter C Erbland
Represented By: Jennifer Fegert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kootenai County Board of Commissioners
Represented By: Peter C Erbland
Represented By: Jennifer Fegert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Resort Aviation Services, Inc.
Represented By: Paul W Daugharty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?