Wagner v. United States Health and Human Services
Plaintiff: Ms. Jacqueline Wagner
Defendant: United States Health and Human Services
Case Number: 2:2019cv00171
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Student Loan
Cause of Action: 20:1080
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on U.S. Attorney District of Idaho on 5/20/2019, filed by Jacqueline Wagner. (Bistline, Arthur)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Plaintiff(s) must serve this Order on all parties who have not entered an appearance via PACER to date. Unless the Plaintiff contacts Courtroom Deputy, Amy Tate, and requests a different date and time, the Court will conduct a telephonic scheduling conference on August 14, 2019, at 10:30 AM mountain time, for purpose of confirming the deadlines proposed by the parties in the joint Litigation Plan. On or before August 14, 2019, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (km)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to United States Health and Human Services. (Print attached Summons for service.) (alw)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Health and Human Services ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1885838.), filed by Jacqueline Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons, #2 Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet)(Bistline, Arthur)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wagner v. United States Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. Jacqueline Wagner
Represented By: Arthur M Bistline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?