Jennings-Moline v. DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Terry Jennings-Moline
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Company, DePuy International Limited, DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Depuy Products, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00235
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (ckh)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Terry Jennings-Moline as to Defendant DePuy International Limited (Larsen, Wes)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for plaintiffs and defendants re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 9/3/2019. (jd)
July 1, 2019 DISREGARD: Set Deadlines/Hearings: Per MDO dkt 129, Within fourteen (14) days of the issuance of this Memorandum Decision and Order, Home Depot will file a motion for costs and fees associated with its preparation and attendance of the canceled Benjamin deposition: Case Management deadline set for 7/15/2019. (jp) Modified on 7/3/2019: DISREGARD this entry. It was docketed in the wrong case (jp).
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT (State court complaint) by Defendants DePuy International Limited, DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Depuy Products, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Company, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 - Summons to DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., #2 Exhibit 3 - Summons to DePuy Products, Inc., #3 Exhibit 4 - Summons to DePuy International Limited, #4 Exhibit 5 - Summons to Johnson & Johnson Company, #5 Exhibit 6 - Summons to Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., #6 Exhibit 7 - Summons Returned Executed to Johnson & Johnson Company, #7 Exhibit 8 - Summons Returned Executed to Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., #8 Exhibit 9 - Summons Returned Executed to DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., #9 Exhibit 10 - Summons Returned Executed to DePuy Products, Inc., #10 Exhibit 11 - Kootenai County District Court Docket)(Watkins, Elijah) Modified to add state court complaint language on 7/2/2019 (jd).
June 26, 2019 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The exhibits to the Notice of Removal are filed incorrectly in this case. All state court documents shall be individual attachments to the Notice of Removal and labeled the document name. The filing party shall re-submit the exhibits under "Supplement".(jd)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DePuy International Limited, DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Depuy Products, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Company, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.. (Watkins, Elijah)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., Depuy Products, Inc., DePuy International Limited, DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Company. (Watkins, Elijah)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., DePuy International Limited, Johnson & Johnson Company, Depuy Products, Inc. from Kootenai County District Court, case number CV28-19-3220.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1904768.), filed by Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., DePuy International Limited, Johnson & Johnson Company, Depuy Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal)(Watkins, Elijah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jennings-Moline v. DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Company
Represented By: Elijah M. Watkins
Represented By: Elijah Martin Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy International Limited
Represented By: Elijah M. Watkins
Represented By: Elijah Martin Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc.
Represented By: Elijah M. Watkins
Represented By: Elijah Martin Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depuy Products, Inc.
Represented By: Elijah M. Watkins
Represented By: Elijah Martin Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.
Represented By: Elijah M. Watkins
Represented By: Elijah Martin Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Jennings-Moline
Represented By: Wes Scott Larsen
Represented By: Wes S Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?