Cox v. Manchester et al
Plaintiff: Eric A. Cox
Defendant: Ryan G. Manchester and C.R. England, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00262
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Robert J Bryan
Referring Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for all parties re #1 Notice of Removal and #6 Answer to Complaint Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 9/30/2019. (ckh)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Answer to Civil Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial) by C.R. England, Inc., Ryan G. Manchester.(Scanlan, Kevin)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. All Counsel and any pro se parties are directed to confer and provide the Court with a combined Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan (the Report) by October 25, 2019. The foregoing Minute Order authorized by The Honorable Robert J. Bryan, United States District Judge. (ckh)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS. All discovery matters should be resolved by agreement if possible. If a ruling is needed on any discovery question, and counsel wish to avoid the time and expense of a written motion, they may obtain an expedited ruling through a telephone conference call to the court. The foregoing Minute Order authorized by The Honorable Robert J. Bryan, United States District Judge. (ckh)
July 23, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. Please use case number 2:19-cv-00262-RJB on all future pleadings. (st)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DOCKET TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert J. Bryan from the Western District of Washington for all further proceedings. Judge David C. Nye no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by C.R. England, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent C.R. England, Inc. for C.R. England, Inc... (Scanlan, Kevin)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by C.R. England, Inc. (Defendant C.R. England, Inc.'s Notice of Removal of Civil Action Under 28 U.S.C. 1441(b) (Diversity)) from Kootenai County, ID, case number CV28-19-4155.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1910312.), filed by C.R. England, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint (from State Court, Kootenai County, ID), #3 Affidavit of Return (C.R. England, Inc.), #4 Summons C.R. England, Inc., #5 Affidavit of Service (Ryan Manchester), #6 Case Summary (received from Kootenai County District Court))(Scanlan, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox v. Manchester et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric A. Cox
Represented By: Mark J King, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan G. Manchester
Represented By: Kevin J Scanlan
Represented By: Joseph M Aldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. England, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin J Scanlan
Represented By: Joseph M Aldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?