United States of America for use and benefit of Mountain Utilities, Inc. v. Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland et al
Plaintiff: United States of America for use and benefit of Mountain Utilities, Inc. and United States of America
Defendant: AMEC Foster Wheeler Environment & Infrastructure, Inc., American Home Assurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company, Anderson Environmental Contracting, LLC, Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland and Wood Environment & Infrastructure Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00293
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. AMEC Foster Wheeler Environment & Infrastructure, Inc. served on 9/6/2019, answer due 9/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint)(Guin, John)
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Zurich American Insurance Company waiver sent on 8/2/2019, answer due 10/1/2019. (Guin, John)
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland waiver sent on 8/2/2019, answer due 10/1/2019. (Guin, John)
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. American Home Assurance Company waiver sent on 8/2/2019, answer due 10/1/2019. (Guin, John)
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Wood Environment & Infrastructure Solutions, Inc. waiver sent on 8/2/2019, answer due 10/1/2019. (Guin, John)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by John H Guin (Guin, John)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 STATUS REPORT re Service of Process by United States of America. (Guin, John)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - the Court will conduct a Telephonic Scheduling Conference on October 28, 2019, at 11:30 AM mountain time, for purpose of confirming the deadlines proposed by the parties in the joint Litigation Plan. Plaintiff must initiate the conference call by placing it to (208) 334-9945 and must have all appropriate parties on the line. On or before October 21, 2019, the parties must file with the Court the Joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (jd)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 American, #2 Anderson, #3 Fidelity, #4 Wood, #5 Zurich)(jd)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United States of America for use and benefit of Mountain Utilities, Inc.. (Guin, John)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1917723.), filed by United States of America for use and benefit of Mountain Utilities, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Fidelity, #3 Summons Zurich, #4 Summons American, #5 Summons Wood, #6 Summons AMEC, #7 Summons Anderson)(Guin, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America for use and benefit of Mountain Utilities, Inc. v. Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America for use and benefit of Mountain Utilities, Inc.
Represented By: John H. Guin
Represented By: John H Guin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: John H. Guin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMEC Foster Wheeler Environment & Infrastructure, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Home Assurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anderson Environmental Contracting, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wood Environment & Infrastructure Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?