Johnson v. Kootenai County
Plaintiff: Benjamin A. Johnson
Defendant: Kootenai County
Case Number: 2:2019cv00339
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 JUDGMENT - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and closed. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - Johnsons Petition for Writ of Mandamus, Judicial Review is DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to Benjamin A. Johnson and counsel for Kootenai County re #6 Notice of Appearance, #1 MOTION for Writ of Mandamus Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 11/25/2019. (jd)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick M Braden on behalf of Kootenai County (Braden, Patrick)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Johnsons Application for Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. #4 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Benjamin A. Johnson. Responses due by 10/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed order)(jd)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Benjamin A. Johnson. (jd)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Kootenai County. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jd)
September 3, 2019 RECEIPT: Fee Received $ 400.00, receipt # 1388 (jd)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Writ of Mandamus entitled "Petition for Writ of Mandamus, Judicial Review" by Plaintiff Benjamin A. Johnson. Responses due by 9/24/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(jd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Kootenai County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kootenai County
Represented By: Patrick M Braden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?