James et al v. Kootenai County
Plaintiff: Hemene James and Nichole James
Defendant: Kootenai County, Warren Keene and Kootenai County Coroner's Office
Case Number: 2:2019cv00460
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Filing 8 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Warren Keene, Kootenai County, Kootenai County Coroner's Office.(Brereton, Katharine)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: Unless the Plaintiffs contact the Courtroom Deputy, Jamie Bracke, and requests a different date and time, the Court will conduct a telephonic scheduling conference on February 4, 2020, at 2:00 p.m. mountain time, for purpose of confirming the deadlines proposed by the parties in the joint Litigation Plan. Plaintiffs must initiate the conference call by placing it to (208) 334-9145 and must have all appropriate parties on the line. On or before January 28, 2020, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
December 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for all parties re #1 Complaint and #4 Notice of Appearance. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 2/10/2020. (ckh)
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Katharine B Brereton on behalf of Warren Keene, Kootenai County, Kootenai County Coroner's Office (Brereton, Katharine)
December 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter C Erbland on behalf of Warren Keene, Kootenai County, Kootenai County Coroner's Office (Erbland, Peter)
December 3, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nichole James, Hemene James. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service Kootenai County, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Service Kootenai County Coroner's Office)(Malek, Tara)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Kootenai County, Kootenai County Coroner's Office and Warren Keene. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Kootenai County Coroner's Office Summons, #2 Warren Keene Summons) (ckh)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1973983.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Kootenai County Coroner, #3 Summons Warren Keene, #4 Summons Kootenai County)(Malek, Tara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James et al v. Kootenai County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kootenai County
Represented By: Katharine B Brereton
Represented By: Peter C Erbland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Keene
Represented By: Katharine B Brereton
Represented By: Peter C Erbland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kootenai County Coroner's Office
Represented By: Katharine B Brereton
Represented By: Peter C Erbland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hemene James
Represented By: Tara Malek
Represented By: Jillian H Caires
Represented By: Katie Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nichole James
Represented By: Tara Malek
Represented By: Jillian H Caires
Represented By: Katie Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?