Tomelleri v. Mark's Marine, Inc.
Plaintiff: Joseph R Tomelleri
Defendant: Mark's Marine, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00479
Filed: December 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Scott J. Strohm for Joseph R Tomelleri Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk). Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Scott J. Strohm. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1987048.)Tracy L Wright appearing for Plaintiff Joseph R Tomelleri. Responses due by 1/10/2020 (Wright, Tracy)
December 6, 2019 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jd)
December 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Mark's Marine, Inc. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jd)
December 6, 2019 Filing 2 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s)VA 1-673-790 (Notice sent to USPTO) (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (jd)
December 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Mark's Marine, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1979158.), filed by Joseph R Tomelleri. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Wright, Tracy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tomelleri v. Mark's Marine, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark's Marine, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph R Tomelleri
Represented By: Tracy L Wright
Represented By: Scott J. Strohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?