Jusselin v. Commissioner of Social Security
Petitioner: Sarah Adeline Jusselin
Respondent: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2020cv00265
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Joanne P Rodriguez on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Rodriguez, Joanne)
June 15, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security (Print attached Summons for service.) (ckh)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING IFP STATUS re #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioner's In Forma Pauperis Application (Dkt. #3 ) is GRANTED and this action shall proceed without the payment of the filing fee. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
June 11, 2020 Filing 7 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE (ckh)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROCEDURAL ORDER SOCIAL SECURITY. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
June 5, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Sarah Adeline Jusselin re #1 Petition for Review. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 6/26/2020. (ckh)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (ckh)
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 First APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Mark B Jones appearing for Petitioner Sarah Adeline Jusselin. Responses due by 6/25/2020 (Jones, Mark)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 Statement of Social Security Number by Sarah Adeline Jusselin This is a sealed document.. (Jones, Mark)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REVIEW - Complaint, CCS, Summons, filed by Sarah Adeline Jusselin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Jones, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jusselin v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sarah Adeline Jusselin
Represented By: Mark B Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Joanne P Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?