Druffel v. Fred Meyer Stores, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tara Druffel
Defendant: Does I-X, The Kroger Co. Foundation, Inc., Fred Meyer Stores, Inc. and The Kroger Co. Foundation, Inc. an Ohio corporation that owns real property and is conducting business in the state of Idaho doing business as Fred Myer Stores
Case Number: 2:2020cv00348
Filed: July 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jp)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Tara Druffel, Fred Meyer Stores, Inc., The Kroger Co. Foundation, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 9/14/2020. (jp)
July 14, 2020 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - Fred Meyer Stores, Inc. served on 7/14/2020; The Kroger Co. Foundation, Inc. served on 7/14/2020. (service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (jp)
July 14, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fred Meyer Stores, Inc.. (Pirtle, Joseph)
July 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Fred Meyer Stores, Inc. from Kootenai County District Court, case number CV28-20-2190.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-2075083.), filed by Fred Meyer Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, part 1 - state court docket sheet, #2 Exhibit A, part 2 - complaint, #3 Exhibit A, part 3 - summons, #4 Exhibit A, part 4 - answer, #5 Exhibit A, part 5 - notice of service of discovery requests, #6 Exhibit A, part 6 - affidavit of service, #7 Exhibit A, part 7 - notice of discovery responses, #8 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's First Set of Requests for Admission, #9 Cover Sheet)(Pirtle, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Druffel v. Fred Meyer Stores, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Co. Foundation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Meyer Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph N Pirtle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Co. Foundation, Inc. an Ohio corporation that owns real property and is conducting business in the state of Idaho doing business as Fred Myer Stores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Druffel
Represented By: Monica Marie Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?