Powell et al v. Crypto Traders Management, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Merav Knafo and David Powell
Defendant: Courtney Lata, Shawn Cutting and Crypto Traders Management, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00352
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 12:22
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - Please disregard docket number #10 Answer to Complaint, as the Court was notified by the filing party of an error in the document. The corrected document was re-filed at docket no. 11. (km)
September 11, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Courtney Lata.(Groberg, Debra)
September 11, 2020 Filing 10 DISREGARD per Corrective Entry. Modified on 9/11/2020 (km).
September 11, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crypto Traders Management, LLC, Shawn Cutting. (Johnson, Wyatt)
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Crypto Traders Management, LLC, Shawn Cutting.(Johnson, Wyatt)
September 3, 2020 Filing 7 DISCOVERY PLAN by Merav Knafo, David Powell . (Wieland, Steven)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Verified Complaint served on Shawn Cutting on 07/31/20, filed by Merav Knafo, David Powell. (Wieland, Steven)
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Verified Complaint served on Crypto Traders Management, LLC on 07/24/20, filed by Merav Knafo, David Powell. (Wieland, Steven)
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Verified Complaint served on Courtney Lata on 07/21/20, filed by Merav Knafo, David Powell. (Wieland, Steven)
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 DOCKET TEXT NOTICE: Plaintiff's counsel shall refer to L.R. 4.1. (lc)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Cutting Summons, #2 Lata Summons) (ckh)
July 17, 2020 Notice of Reassignment and Case Number Change: Case was opened with incorrect division. Corrected to Northern Division and case reassigned to Judge Ronald E. Bush. Please use case number 2:20-cv-00352-REB for all future filings. (ckh)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Complaint against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-2076302.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons - Crypto Traders Management, LLC, #3 Summons Summons - Shawn Cutting, #4 Summons Summons - Courtney Lata)(Wieland, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powell et al v. Crypto Traders Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merav Knafo
Represented By: Steven P Wieland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Powell
Represented By: Steven P Wieland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtney Lata
Represented By: Debra Anne Groberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Cutting
Represented By: Wyatt Benton Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crypto Traders Management, LLC
Represented By: Wyatt Benton Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?