Schwendeman v. Crypto Traders Management, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Chad J Schwendeman
Defendant: Shawn Cutting, Crypto Traders Management, LLC and Does I-X
Case Number: 2:2020cv00448
Filed: September 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Referring Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Chad J Schwendeman (Creason, Samuel)
September 23, 2020 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Crypto Traders Management, LLC. (Points, Michelle)
September 23, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Crypto Traders Management, LLC, Shawn Cutting, Chad J Schwendeman re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 11/23/2020. (jp)
September 23, 2020 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, this case was opened with the incorrect division. It has been changed from southern to northern because the case was removed from Kootenai County. Case randomly reassigned to Judge B. Lynn Winmill for all further proceedings. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 2:20-cv-448-BLW (jp)
September 22, 2020 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - Crypto Traders Management, LLC served on 9/22/2020; Shawn Cutting served on 9/22/2020. (service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (jp)
September 22, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Crypto Traders Management, LLC and Shawn Cutting from First District, case number CV28-20-4979.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-2104768.), filed by Crypto Traders Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Acceptance of Service, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Register of Actions)(Points, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schwendeman v. Crypto Traders Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Cutting
Represented By: Wyatt Benton Johnson
Represented By: Michelle R Points
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crypto Traders Management, LLC
Represented By: Wyatt Benton Johnson
Represented By: Michelle R Points
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad J Schwendeman
Represented By: Samuel Toevs Creason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?