Merkeley, et al. v U.S. Bank National Association
Plaintiff: Donna Higgins Merkeley and Ward D. Merkeley
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association and U.S. Bank National Association a national association doing business as U.S. Bank
Case Number: 2:2020cv00479
Filed: October 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Transfer Case , or Alternatively, to Dismiss filed by U.S. Bank National Association.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/24/2020.(Lloyd, Thomas)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER (STANDARD TRACK) - All dispositive motions, including motions for punitive damages, must be filed by August 27, 2021. Motions to amend pleadings and join parties, except for allegations of punitive damages, must be filed on or before January 15, 2021. ADR must be held by May 28, 2021. All fact discovery must be completed by June 30, 2021. The Court will conduct a telephonic status conference with the parties on August 3, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. Mountain Time for the purpose of inquiring about the status of discovery. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
November 18, 2020 Filing 13 Docket Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Candy W. Dale: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 11/18/2020. Mischelle Fulgham appeared for Plaintiff, Meagan Tom and Thomas Lloyd appeared for Defendant. Court approves the stipulated litigation and discovery plan. A scheduling order is forthcoming which will set a telephonic status conference. Hearing Not Recorded. (st)
November 12, 2020 Filing 12 DISCOVERY PLAN by U.S. Bank National Association re #11 Scheduling Conf Form/Litigation Plan . (Lloyd, Thomas)
November 12, 2020 Filing 11 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by U.S. Bank National Association. (Lloyd, Thomas)
November 11, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by U.S. Bank National Association. (Lloyd, Thomas)
November 10, 2020 Filing 9 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE(jd)
November 9, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Transfer Case , or Alternatively, to Dismiss filed by Ward D. Merkeley. Replies due by 11/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Mischelle R. Fulgham ISO Pl's Response to Motion to Transfer Venue)(Fulgham, Mischelle)
November 5, 2020 Filing 7 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jd)
October 16, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Transfer Case , or Alternatively, to Dismiss Thomas John Lloyd, III appearing for Defendant U.S. Bank National Association. Responses due by 11/6/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit / Declaration of Meagan S. Tom, #3 Exhibit 1)(Lloyd, Thomas)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - On or before November 12, 2020, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/18/2020 04:00 PM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Meagan S. Tom for U.S. Bank National Association Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk). Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
October 13, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Meagan S. Tom. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-2114128.)Thomas John Lloyd, III appearing for Defendant U.S. Bank National Association. Responses due by 11/3/2020 (Lloyd, Thomas)
October 13, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Donna Higgins Merkeley, Ward D. Merkeley and counsel for U.S. Bank National Association re #1 Notice of Removal. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 12/14/2020. (jd)
October 13, 2020 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - All Defendants. (no service document on file, service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (jd)
October 13, 2020 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jd)
October 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by U.S. Bank National Association from Kootenai County, case number CV28-20-5739.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-2113280.), filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Part A, #2 Exhibit 1, Part B, #3 Exhibit 1, Part C, #4 Cover Sheet)(Lloyd, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merkeley, et al. v U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Higgins Merkeley
Represented By: Mischelle R Fulgham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ward D. Merkeley
Represented By: Mischelle R Fulgham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Thomas John Lloyd, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association a national association doing business as U.S. Bank
Represented By: Thomas John Lloyd, III
Represented By: Meagan S. Tom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?