United States Securities and Exchange Commission v. Crypto Traders Management, LLC et al
Plaintiff: United States Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Janine M. Cutting, Lake View Trust, Tyson Trust, Golden Cross Investments, LLC, Shawn C. Cutting and Crypto Traders Management, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00103
Filed: March 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Expedited MOTION for Hearing re #11 MOTION Relief from TRO/PI re #10 Order, Terminate Motions, Terminate Hearings Michelle R Points appearing for Defendants Janine M. Cutting, Shawn C. Cutting. Responses due by 6/7/2021 (Points, Michelle)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER PERMITTING INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS TO OPEN AND USE NEW BANK ACCOUNTS. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (kt)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 DISCOVERY PLAN by United States Securities and Exchange Commission . (Miller, Terry)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Miller, Terry)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION Relief from TRO/PI re #10 Order, Terminate Motions, Terminate Hearings filed by Janine M. Cutting, Shawn C. Cutting.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Counsel RE Second Motion for Limited Relief, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Shawn Cutting RE Second Motion for Limited Relief and Sworn Accounting)(Points, Michelle)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for Relief Stipulated Motion Permitting the Opening of a Bank Account Michelle R Points appearing for Defendants Janine M. Cutting, Shawn C. Cutting. Responses due by 5/12/2021 (Points, Michelle)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #19 Answer to Complaint filed by Tyson Trust, Shawn C. Cutting, Golden Cross Investments, LLC, Crypto Traders Management, LLC, Lake View Trust, Janine M. Cutting was filed in error. Please disregard per corrected filing, docket #20 .(kt)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Correct ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Crypto Traders Management, LLC, Janine M. Cutting, Shawn C. Cutting, Golden Cross Investments, LLC, Lake View Trust, Tyson Trust.(Points, Michelle)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 DISREGARD - ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Crypto Traders Management, LLC, Janine M. Cutting, Shawn C. Cutting, Golden Cross Investments, LLC, Lake View Trust, Tyson Trust.(Points, Michelle) See corrective entry on 4/21/2021 (kt).
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crypto Traders Management, LLC, Janine M. Cutting, Shawn C. Cutting, Golden Cross Investments, LLC, Lake View Trust, Tyson Trust. (Points, Michelle)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Temporary Restraining Order, Asset Freeze, and Order Granting Other Emergency Relief and setting Hearing to Show Cause, Complaint (Doc. # 1), Civil Cover Sheet (Doc. # 1-1), The SECs Ex Parte Emergency Motion for Restraining Order, Asset Freeze, Order to Show Cause, and Other Relief (Doc. # 2), The SECs Memorandum of Law in Support of its Ex Parte Emergency Motion for Restraining Order, Asset Freeze, Order to Show Cause, and Other Relief (Doc. # 2-1) and Exhibit 1 thereto, Declaration of Terry R. Miller (Doc. # 2-3), Declaration of Matthew L. Skidmore (Doc. # 2-4), Declaration Robert Ullman (Doc. # 2-7), Declaration of Stephen Wilcox (Doc. # 2-8), Proposed TRO, The SECs Motion to Exceed Page Limit for Memorandum in Support of Motion for Ex Parte Emergency Motion tor Restraining Order, Asset Freeze, Order to Show Cause, and Other Relief (Doc. # 3), The SECs Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Exceed Page Limit for Memorandum in Support of Ex Parte Emergency Motion for Asset Freeze, Order to Show Cause, and Other Relief (Doc. # 3-1), summons issued to Defendant and Relief Defendants (Doc. # 4, 4-1, 4-2, 4-3, 4-4, and 4-5) served on SHAWN C. CUTTING, CRYPTO TRADERS MANAGEMENT, LLC, JANINE M. CUTTING, GOLDEN CROSS INVESTMENTS, LLC, LAKE VIEW TRUST, and TYSON TRUST on 3/10/2021 and 3/11/2021, filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Miller, Terry)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION Relief from TRO/PI re #10 Order, Terminate Motions, Terminate Hearings filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Replies due by 4/21/2021.(Miller, Terry)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE.Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 5/17/2021 11:00 AM mountain time, for purpose of confirming the deadlines proposed by the parties in the joint Litigation Plan. On or before May 10, 2021, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (kt)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen C McKenna on behalf of United States Securities and Exchange Commission (McKenna, Stephen)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Crypto Traders Management, LLC, Janine M. Cutting, Shawn C. Cutting, Golden Cross Investments, LLC, Lake View Trust, Tyson Trust, United States Securities and Exchange Commission re #12 Answer to Complaint and #1 Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 6/1/2021. (jd)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jd)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Crypto Traders Management, LLC, Janine M. Cutting, Shawn C. Cutting, Golden Cross Investments, LLC, Lake View Trust, Tyson Trust.(Points, Michelle)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION Relief from TRO/PI re #10 Order, Terminate Motions, Terminate Hearings Michelle R Points appearing for Defendant Shawn C. Cutting. Responses due by 4/7/2021 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Points, Michelle)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, ASSET FREEZE, AND ORDER GRANTING OTHER RELIEF - Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Terry Miller appearing for Plaintiff United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Responses due by 4/6/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Protective Order)(Miller, Terry)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REDACTION of Exhibits 1-31 re: Docket no. #2 by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Exhibits 14-31 to Skidmore Declaration) (km)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER granting #3 Ex Parte Motion to Exceed Page Limit. Good cause appearing, the Court hereby grants the request to file an overlength brief. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (aa)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #2 EX PARTE MOTION filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission, Motions terminated: #2 EX PARTE MOTION filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (jd)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to Order to Show Cause. Responses due by 3/15/2021. Replies due by 3/17/2021. (jd)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this matter is REASSIGNED to District Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ab)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Crypto Traders Management, LLC, Janine M. Cutting, Shawn C. Cutting, Golden Cross Investments, LLC, Lake View Trust, Tyson Trust. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons - Crytpo Traders, #2 Summons - Janine Cutting, #3 Summons - Golden Cross, #4 Summons - Lake View, #5 Summons - Tyson Trust) (km) Modified on 3/5/2021 to update security (km).
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 EX PARTE MOTION to Exceed Page LimitTerry Miller, Stephen Mckenna appearing for Plaintiff United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Responses due by 3/26/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support) (km)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 EMERGENCY MOTION Terry Miller, Stephen Mckenna appearing for Plaintiff United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Responses due by 3/26/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Memo in Support Exhibit 1, #3 Declaration of Terry Miller, #4 Declaration of Matthew Skidmore, #5 Skidmore Delcaration Exhibits 1-13, #6 Skidmore Declaration Exhibits 14-31, #7 Declaration of Robert Ullman, #8 Declaration of Stephen Wilcox)(km)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Crypto Traders Management, LLC, Janine M. Cutting, Golden Cross Investments, LLC, Lake View Trust, filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (km)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Judge B. Lynn Winmill for all further proceedings. Judge David C. Nye no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 2:21-cv-00103-BLW. (jd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Securities and Exchange Commission v. Crypto Traders Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janine M. Cutting
Represented By: Michelle R Points
Represented By: Wyatt Benton Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake View Trust
Represented By: Michelle R Points
Represented By: Wyatt Benton Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Trust
Represented By: Michelle R Points
Represented By: Wyatt Benton Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Cross Investments, LLC
Represented By: Michelle R Points
Represented By: Wyatt Benton Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn C. Cutting
Represented By: Michelle R Points
Represented By: Wyatt Benton Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crypto Traders Management, LLC
Represented By: Michelle R Points
Represented By: Wyatt Benton Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Stephen Mckenna
Represented By: Terry Miller
Represented By: Stephen C McKenna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?