Snyder v. Robinson, et al.
Plaintiff: James Franklin Snyder
Defendant: Katlin Lynn Robinson, Brandon Colt Bowcut, Donald Lamar Horton and Officer Codey Dibias
Case Number: 2:2021cv00328
Filed: August 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Referring Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2022 Filing 20 SUPPLEMENT, the missing page 2 of the complaint by Plaintiff James Franklin Snyder re #2 Complaint. (jd)
January 3, 2022 Filing 19 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (alw)
December 30, 2021 Filing 18 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (alw)
December 30, 2021 Filing 17 Defendants' ANSWER to #2 Complaint for Violation of Civil Rights by Brandon Colt Bowcut, Donald Lamar Horton, Katlin Lynn Robinson.(Hazel, Joel)
December 29, 2021 Filing 16 Defendant Codey Dibias' ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Codey Dibias.(Brereton, Katharine)
December 29, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Codey Dibias. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 2/28/2022. (kt)
December 29, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Katharine B. Brereton on behalf of Codey Dibias (Brereton, Katharine)
December 22, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Brandon Colt Bowcut, Donald Lamar Horton, Katlin Lynn Robinson, James Franklin Snyder re #2 Complaint, #12 Notice of Appearance Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 2/22/2022. (alw)
December 21, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel P Hazel on behalf of Brandon Colt Bowcut, Donald Lamar Horton, Katlin Lynn Robinson (Hazel, Joel)
December 17, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed, Process receipt and return by James Franklin Snyder. All Defendants. (alw)
December 2, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons USM 285 sent to USM, #2 Summons USM 285 sent to USM, #3 Summons USM 285 sent to USM)(lm)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL REVIEW ORDER BYSCREENING JUDGE - IT IS ORDERED that: Plaintiffs Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Dkt.[ 1]) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs Motion for Appointment of Counsel (Dkt. #3 ) is DENIED. Plaintiffs Emergency Motion for State Case to be Moved into Federal Court is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiffs Motion for Evidence Police BodyCam Video is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge B Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lm) (Main Document 9 replaced on 12/2/2021) (lm).
September 7, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION evidence police bodycam video by Plaintiff James Franklin Snyder. Responses due by 9/28/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(alw) (1 CD received and maintained in Boise clerks office file room.) Modified on 9/13/2021 (kmp).
August 26, 2021 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiff James Franklin Snyder re #3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. (jd)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - All emails or documents that are not filed in compliance with this order, the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and the District of Idaho Local Civil Rules will be returned to the Plaintiff without being filed in this case or considered by the Court. Signed by Judge B Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
August 20, 2021 Filing 5 Emergency MOTION for State Case to be Moved into Federal Court by Plaintiff James Franklin Snyder. Responses due by 9/10/2021 (alw)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (kt)
August 16, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff James Snyder. Responses due by 9/7/2021 (kt) Modified on 8/19/2021 to change party who filed motion (alw).
August 16, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by James Franklin Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Table of Contents, #3 Exhibit 1-4)(kt)
August 16, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff James Franklin Snyder. Responses due by 9/7/2021 (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(kt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snyder v. Robinson, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Franklin Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katlin Lynn Robinson
Represented By: Joel P Hazel
Represented By: Nathan Jason Orlando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Colt Bowcut
Represented By: Joel P Hazel
Represented By: Nathan Jason Orlando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Lamar Horton
Represented By: Joel P Hazel
Represented By: Nathan Jason Orlando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Codey Dibias
Represented By: Katharine B. Brereton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?